EP2974131 - DEVICE-TO-DEVICE COMMUNICATION FOR RESOURCE SHARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERNANDEZ, Thomas J. 4340 NW 147th Avenue Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 02 /
DOMINGO YAGUEZ, Gustavo D. Alicante 525 Villa Allende Cordoba 5105 / AR | 03 /
MEINGAST, Marci 1945 Berkley Way Apt. 16 Berkley, California 94704 / US | 04 /
BILGEN, Aras 19 Mayis Mauzay SOK USTA SIT A Blok D:8 Kazasker, Istambul, TR 34736 / TR | 05 /
SHAW, David I. 6495 NW Shlsam Terrace Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 06 /
CHINYA, Gautham N. 125 SE 49th Court Hillsboro, Oregon 97123 / US | [2016/30] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
HERNANDEZ, Thomas J. 4340 NW 147th Avenue Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | ||
02 /
DOMINGO YAGUEZ, Gustavo D. Alicante 525 Villa Allende Cordoba 5105 / AR | |||
03 /
MEINGAST, Marci 1945 Berkley Way Apt. 16 Berkley, California 94704 / US | |||
04 /
BILGEN, Aras 19 Mayis Mah Uzay Sok Usta Sitesi A Blok D:8 Istanbul / TR | |||
05 /
SHAW, David I. 6495 NW Shlsam Terrace Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | |||
06 /
CHINYA, Gautham N. 125 SE 49th Court Hillsboro, Oregon 97123 / US | Representative(s) | Schäflein, Christian Georg Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/37] | Schäflein, Christian Georg Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/03] | Schäflein, Christian Georg Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13878142.2 | 13.03.2013 | [2016/03] | WO2013US31008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014142848 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2974131 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2974131 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/00, H04W72/04, H04W76/14, // H04L29/06, G06F21/33, G06F21/44 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
H04L63/101 (EP,US);
H04L47/82 (US);
G06F21/335 (EP,US);
G06F21/445 (EP,US);
H04L63/061 (EP,US);
H04L63/18 (EP,US);
H04L65/1069 (US);
H04L67/1076 (US);
H04L69/329 (US);
H04W12/04 (US);
H04W12/50 (EP,US);
H04W4/12 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/39] | H04L12/12, H04L29/06, H04W12/04, H04W4/12, H04L29/08, H04L12/911, G06F21/33, G06F21/44 | ||
Former IPC [2016/03] | H04L12/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | D2D-KOMMUNIKATIONEN FÜR GEMEINSAME RESSOURCENNUTZUNG | [2016/03] | English: | DEVICE-TO-DEVICE COMMUNICATION FOR RESOURCE SHARING | [2016/03] | French: | COMMUNICATION DE DISPOSITIF À DISPOSITIF POUR UN PARTAGE DE RESSOURCES | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 06.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2013 | AL | 09.09.2020 | AT | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | CZ | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | ES | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | IT | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | PL | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SE | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | IE | 13.03.2021 | LU | 13.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 13.03.2013 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005198029 (POHJA SEPPO [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0096] - [0173] * * figures 1-8 *; | [I]US2009111378 (SHEYNMAN ARNOLD [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0115]; figures 1-16 *; | [A]US2010167646 (ALAMEH RACHID [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0016] - [0041]; figures 1-4 *; | [I]US2011081923 (FORUTANPOUR BABAK [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] - [0094]; figures 1-24 *; | [I] - WIFI ALLIANCE, "Wi-Fi CERTIFIED Miracast (TM): Extending the Wi-Fi experience to seamless video display", INTERNET CITATION, (20120919), pages 1 - 18, URL: https://www.wi-fi.org/sites/default/files/uploads/wp_Miracast_Industry_20120919.pdff, (20130704), XP002700078 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2008263235 (HANS MATHIEU C [US], et al); | [Y]US2011081923 (FORUTANPOUR BABAK [US], et al); | [Y]US2011275316 (SUUMAEKI JAN [FI], et al); | [A]US2012197988 (LEPPAENEN KARI JUHANI [FI], et al); | [A]US2012331059 (LUNA MICHAEL [US]) | by applicant | US2005198029 | US2009111378 | US2010167646 | US2011081923 | - WI-FI CERTIFIED MIRACASTTM: EXTENDING THE WI-FI EXPERIENCE TO SEAMLESS VIDEO DISPLAY, (2012), URL: https://www.wi-fi.org/sites/default/files/ uploads/wp_Miracast_Industry_20120919 |