EP2979368 - TECHNIQUES FOR BEAMFORMING TO MITIGATE MULTI-USER LEAKAGE AND INTERFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAJADIEH, Masoud c/o Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard M/S: RNB4-140 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 02 /
SHIRANI-MEHR, Hooman 4873 NW Promenade Terrase Unit 121 Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2016/08] |
Former [2016/05] | 01 /
SAJADIEH, Masoud 673 Patriot Place Fremont, California 94539 / US | ||
02 /
SHIRANI-MEHR, Hooman 4873 NW Promenade Terrase Unit 121 Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/10] |
Former [2016/05] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13880482.8 | 27.09.2013 | [2016/05] | WO2013US62401 | Priority number, date | US201361806821P | 29.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361806821 P | [2016/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014158226 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2979368 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2979368 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H04L1/06, H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04L25/02, H04W72/04 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
H04B7/0452 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (KR);
H04L1/1864 (EP,CN,US);
H04W8/082 (US);
H04B1/56 (US);
H04B7/0417 (US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/0619 (US);
H04B7/063 (EP,US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04B7/088 (EP,US);
H04L25/0204 (US);
H04L25/03305 (US);
H04L47/803 (EP,US);
H04L47/83 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0051 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0057 (CN,US);
H04L5/0085 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/1469 (EP);
H04L65/613 (EP,US);
H04L65/65 (US);
H04L65/70 (EP,US);
H04L65/75 (US);
H04L65/752 (EP);
H04L65/756 (EP);
H04L65/762 (EP,US);
H04L65/764 (EP,US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04M1/72457 (US);
H04N21/2402 (EP,US);
H04N21/8456 (EP,US);
H04N21/8543 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (US);
H04W24/02 (US);
H04W24/04 (KR);
H04W28/02 (EP,US);
H04W28/0226 (US);
H04W28/0289 (US);
H04W28/20 (US);
H04W36/0011 (EP,US);
H04W36/0022 (EP,US);
H04W36/125 (EP,US);
H04W36/22 (KR,US);
H04W36/26 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W4/021 (EP,US);
H04W48/06 (US);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04W48/18 (EP,CN,US);
H04W56/001 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/541 (US);
H04W76/15 (US);
H04W8/02 (US);
H04W8/06 (US);
H04L2025/03426 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0055 (EP);
H04W28/082 (US);
H04W36/0072 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (CN,US);
H04W48/12 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/046 (US);
H04W84/042 (US);
H04W84/045 (US);
H04W84/12 (US);
H04W88/02 (US);
H04W88/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/05] | H04B7/04, H04L1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRAHLFORMUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON LECKAGEN UND INTERFERENZEN DURCH MEHRERE BENUTZER | [2016/05] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR BEAMFORMING TO MITIGATE MULTI-USER LEAKAGE AND INTERFERENCE | [2016/05] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE FORMATION DE FAISCEAUX DESTINÉES À ATTÉNUER LES FUITES ET INTERFÉRENCES MULTI-UTILISATEURS | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 30.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2013 | AL | 07.03.2018 | AT | 07.03.2018 | CY | 07.03.2018 | CZ | 07.03.2018 | DK | 07.03.2018 | EE | 07.03.2018 | ES | 07.03.2018 | FI | 07.03.2018 | HR | 07.03.2018 | IT | 07.03.2018 | LT | 07.03.2018 | LV | 07.03.2018 | MC | 07.03.2018 | MK | 07.03.2018 | NL | 07.03.2018 | PL | 07.03.2018 | RO | 07.03.2018 | RS | 07.03.2018 | SE | 07.03.2018 | SI | 07.03.2018 | SK | 07.03.2018 | SM | 07.03.2018 | TR | 07.03.2018 | BG | 07.06.2018 | NO | 07.06.2018 | GR | 08.06.2018 | IS | 07.07.2018 | PT | 09.07.2018 | GB | 27.09.2018 | IE | 27.09.2018 | LU | 27.09.2018 | MT | 27.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | FR | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MK | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
GB | 27.09.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
MT | 27.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
GB | 27.09.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
MT | 27.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
GB | 27.09.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
MT | 27.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
GB | 27.09.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
MT | 27.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
GB | 27.09.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2129173 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0041]; figure 1; claim 12 *; | [A] - WAGNER J ET AL, "On the balance of multiuser diversity and spatial multiplexing gain in random beamforming", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080701), vol. 7, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TWC.2008.060111, ISSN 1536-1276, pages 2512 - 2525, XP011231596 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [III.] , [VII.A.] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TWC.2008.060111 | International search | [Y]US2009196272 (TSUTSUI MASAFUMI [JP]); | [A]US2009322613 (BALA ERDEM [US], et al); | [A]JP2010538577 (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (PUBL); | [A]KR20110044717 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [Y]WO2012022372 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) |