EP2984882 - LOCATION DETERMINATION OF A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2016/07] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive W. Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEN, Souvik 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 02 /
KIM, Kyu-Han 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | Hufton, David Alan HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [2016/07] | Application number, filing date | 13881625.1 | 12.04.2013 | [2016/07] | WO2013US36501 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014168636 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2984882 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, H04W4/20, H04W64/00, G01S5/02, G01S5/00, G01S5/12 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
G01S5/06 (EP,US);
G01S5/0036 (EP,US);
G01S5/02 (EP,US);
G01S5/0284 (EP,US);
G01S5/12 (EP,US);
H04B7/04 (US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
H04W4/023 (US);
H04W4/025 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/07] | H04W64/00, G01S5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Title | German: | POSITIONSBESTIMMUNG EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG | [2016/07] | English: | LOCATION DETERMINATION OF A MOBILE DEVICE | [2016/07] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE L'EMPLACEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2016/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 18.11.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008311944 (HANSEN CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0065] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2011074633 (PUN KA SHUN CARSON [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0150] ** figures 1-23 *; | [X]US2011223940 (ZHONG CHUAN [CN], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0069] * * figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]WO2004032540 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]); | [A]US2005130677 (MEUNIER JEAN-LUC [FR], et al); | [A]KR100977246B (ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE ET AL.); | [A]US2012258729 (SIOMINA IANA [SE], et al); | [A]WO2013024278 (OVERLAY MEDIA LTD, et al) |