EP2848117 - Feeding pan for poultry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fienhage Poultry Solutions GmbH Vechtaer Straße 90 49424 Lutten / DE | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fienhage, Hans-Jürgen Vechtaer Strasse 90 49424 Lutten / DE | 02 /
Rensing, Frank Braakkamp 2 49429 Visbek / DE | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Bischof, Oliver An den Speichern 6 48157 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Hoffmeister, Helmut, et al Dr. Hoffmeister & Bischof Patentanwalt und Rechtsanwalt Goldstraße 36 48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 14002979.4 | 28.08.2014 | [2015/12] | Priority number, date | DE201320104157U | 12.09.2013 Original published format: DE 202013104157 U | [2015/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2848117 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2848117 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01K39/012 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
A01K39/0125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] |
Former [2015/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Geflügelfutterschale | [2015/12] | English: | Feeding pan for poultry | [2015/12] | French: | Distributeur d'aliments pour volailles | [2015/12] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 02.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2014 | AL | 18.11.2015 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | FI | 18.11.2015 | HR | 18.11.2015 | LT | 18.11.2015 | LV | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | MK | 18.11.2015 | MT | 18.11.2015 | PL | 18.11.2015 | RO | 18.11.2015 | RS | 18.11.2015 | SE | 18.11.2015 | SI | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | SM | 18.11.2015 | NO | 18.02.2016 | GR | 19.02.2016 | IS | 18.03.2016 | PT | 18.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 28.08.2014 | |
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 28.08.2014 | |
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 28.08.2014 | |
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 18.11.2015 | |
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 18.11.2015 | |
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 18.11.2015 | |
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 18.11.2015 | |
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 18.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2008131198 (GSI GROUP INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-11 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0040]; figure - *; | [A]DE10164122 (BIG DUTCHMAN INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0057]; figure - *; | [A]EP2394510 (PAL BULLERMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026]; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US5875733 (CHEN AI-MEI [TW]) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 15 - column 3, line 16; figure - *; | [A]US5718187 (POLLOCK EUGENE B [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2008131198 |