EP2746802 - Wireless position determination using adjusted round trip time measurements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aggarwal, Alok 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
Naguib, Ayman 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
Sridhara, Vinay 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 04 /
Das, Saumitra Mohan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/30] | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/26] | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14020043.7 | 20.11.2009 | [2014/26] | Priority number, date | US20080116996P | 21.11.2008 Original published format: US 116996 P | US20080117055P | 21.11.2008 Original published format: US 117055 P | US20090622289 | 19.11.2009 Original published format: US 622289 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2746802 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2746802 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, G01S5/14, G01S13/76, // H04W64/00 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
G01S5/14 (EP,KR,US);
G01S5/10 (KR,US);
G01S13/765 (EP,KR,US);
H04W24/00 (KR,US);
H04W64/00 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/26] | G01S5/02, G01S5/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Title | German: | Drahtlose Positionsermittlung unter Verwendung von angepassten Umlaufzeitmessungen | [2014/26] | English: | Wireless position determination using adjusted round trip time measurements | [2014/26] | French: | Détermination de position sans fil utilisant des mesures temporelles aller-retour ajustées | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 19.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09760407.8 / EP2368131 | EP12008413.2 / EP2600165 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2009 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | NL | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | PT | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IE | 20.11.2018 | LU | 20.11.2018 | MT | 20.11.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 20.11.2009 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IE | 20.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
MT | 20.11.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IE | 20.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
MT | 20.11.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IE | 20.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
MT | 20.11.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IE | 20.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
MT | 20.11.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IE | 20.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IE | 20.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
LU | 20.11.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007056738 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 11,12 * abstract * * table 1 * * paragraphs [0040] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0070] - [0074] * * paragraphs [0081] - [0087] ** paragraph [0128] *; | [XYI]WO2008121878 (PROXIMETRY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8,13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0054] * [Y] 11,12 [I] 9,10 |