EP2770488 - A passenger services system for an aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2017/51] |
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ibrahim, Yakentim M. 22520 23rd Place West Brier, WA 98036 / US | 02 /
Scown, Stephen L. 15822 70th Avenue NW Stanwood, WA Washington 98292 / US | 03 /
Mehlhaff, Mark Gus 1545 Northwest Market St., Apt. 218 Seattle, WA Washington 98107 / US | 04 /
Regan, Casey C. 6917 135th St. SE Snohomish, WA Washington 98296 / US | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/35] | Application number, filing date | 14151521.3 | 17.01.2014 | [2014/35] | Priority number, date | US201313773506 | 21.02.2013 Original published format: US201313773506 | [2014/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2770488 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2770488 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G08C23/04 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
G08C23/04 (EP,BR,RU,US);
H04B10/1141 (BR);
B64D11/00 (RU);
G08C2201/63 (EP,US);
G08C2201/71 (EP,US);
H04B10/03 (US);
H04B10/11 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] |
Former [2014/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | System für Personendienste für ein Flugzeug | [2014/35] | English: | A passenger services system for an aircraft | [2014/35] | French: | Système de services pour passagers d'un aéronef | [2014/35] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 08.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.01.2014 | AL | 20.12.2017 | AT | 20.12.2017 | CY | 20.12.2017 | CZ | 20.12.2017 | DK | 20.12.2017 | EE | 20.12.2017 | ES | 20.12.2017 | FI | 20.12.2017 | HR | 20.12.2017 | LT | 20.12.2017 | LV | 20.12.2017 | MC | 20.12.2017 | MK | 20.12.2017 | NL | 20.12.2017 | PL | 20.12.2017 | PT | 20.12.2017 | RO | 20.12.2017 | RS | 20.12.2017 | SE | 20.12.2017 | SI | 20.12.2017 | SK | 20.12.2017 | SM | 20.12.2017 | TR | 20.12.2017 | IE | 17.01.2018 | LU | 17.01.2018 | MT | 17.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | BG | 20.03.2018 | NO | 20.03.2018 | GR | 21.03.2018 | IS | 20.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.01.2014 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MK | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 17.01.2014 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4412355 (TERBRACK WILLIAM H [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10,12-15 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 3 * [I] 6,7,11; | [A]DE3242978 (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 7 - page 15, line 4 *; | [A]GB2430118 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] ** paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0040] * | Examination | US2003114178 |