EP2896628 - Process for efficient purification of neutral human milk oligosaccharides (HMOs) from microbial fermentation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 15.11.2023 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chr. Hansen HMO GmbH Maarweg 32 53619 Rheinbreitbach / DE | [2021/25] |
Former [2015/30] | For all designated states Jennewein Biotechnologie GmbH Maarweg 32 53619 Rheinbreitbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jennewein, Dr. Stefan Wichfriedweg 14 53604 Bad Honnef / DE | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/38] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/30] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14151737.5 | 20.01.2014 | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2896628 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2896628 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07H1/08, C07H3/06, A23L29/30, A23L33/00, A23L33/21, A61K31/702, C12P19/14, A23L5/00 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
C07H1/08 (EP,CN,CZ,DK,KR,US);
C07H3/06 (EP,AT,CN,CZ,DK,KR,US);
C12N1/20 (RU);
A61K31/702 (EP,AT,CZ,DK,US);
A23K20/163 (KR);
A23L29/30 (EP,DK,KR,US);
A23L33/00 (DK);
A23L33/21 (EP,DK,KR,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,AT,KR,US);
A23L5/00 (EP,DK,US);
A61P1/00 (EP,CZ);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/14 (AT);
C07H1/06 (RU);
C12P19/00 (RU);
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | C07H1/08, C07H3/06, A23L1/308 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2015/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur effizienten Reinigung von neutralen humanen Milch-Oligosacchariden (HMOs) aus mikrobieller Fermentation | [2015/30] | English: | Process for efficient purification of neutral human milk oligosaccharides (HMOs) from microbial fermentation | [2015/30] | French: | Procédé permettant de purifier efficacement des oligosaccharides du lait humain neutre (HMO) à partir de la fermentation microbienne | [2015/30] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 08.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2017 | Observations by third parties | 13.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2017 | Observations by third parties | 26.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.06.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.11.2018 | Observations by third parties | 22.10.2019 | Observations by third parties | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2019
24.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | 02
18.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | 03
18.06.2019
24.06.2019
WITHDRAWN Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | 04
19.06.2019
27.09.2021
WITHDRAWN Glycom A/S Kogle Allé 4 2970 Hørsholm / DK Opponent's representative Strych, Sebastian, et al, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | 05
19.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | 06
23.04.2020
20.05.2021
WITHDRAWN Nestlé Deutschland AG Lyoner Str. 23 60528 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2019
24.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | ||
02
18.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | |||
03
18.06.2019
24.06.2019
WITHDRAWN Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | |||
04
19.06.2019
27.09.2021
WITHDRAWN Glycom A/S Kogle Allé 4 2970 Hørsholm / DK Opponent's representative Strych, Sebastian, et al, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | |||
05
19.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
06
23.04.2020
20.05.2021
WITHDRAWN Nestlé Deutschland AG Lyoner Str. 23 60528 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2021/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2019
24.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | ||
02
18.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | |||
03
18.06.2019
24.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | |||
04
19.06.2019
27.09.2021
WITHDRAWN Glycom A/S Kogle Allé 4 2970 Hørsholm / DK Opponent's representative Strych, Sebastian, et al, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | |||
05
19.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
06
23.04.2020
20.05.2021
WITHDRAWN Nestlé Deutschland AG Lyoner Str. 23 60528 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2021/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2019
24.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | ||
02
18.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | |||
03
18.06.2019
24.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | |||
04
19.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Glycom A/S Kogle Allé 4 2970 Hørsholm / DK Opponent's representative Strych, Sebastian, et al, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | |||
05
19.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | |||
06
23.04.2020
20.05.2021
WITHDRAWN Nestlé Deutschland AG Lyoner Str. 23 60528 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2020/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2019
24.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | ||
02
18.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | |||
03
18.06.2019
24.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | |||
04
19.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Glycom A/S Kogle Allé 4 2970 Hørsholm / DK Opponent's representative Strych, Sebastian, et al, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | |||
05
19.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | |||
06
23.04.2020
27.04.2020
INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE Nestlé Deutschland AG Lyoner Str. 23 60528 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2020/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2019
24.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | ||
02
18.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | |||
03
18.06.2019
24.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | |||
04
19.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Glycom A/S Kogle Allé 4 2970 Hørsholm / DK Opponent's representative Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | |||
05
19.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | |||
06
23.04.2020
27.04.2020
INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE Nestlé Deutschland AG Lyoner Str. 23 60528 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2020/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2019
24.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | ||
02
18.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | |||
03
18.06.2019
24.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | |||
04
19.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Glycom A/S Kogle Allé 4 2970 Hørsholm / DK Opponent's representative Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | |||
05
19.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2019/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2019
24.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | ||
02
18.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | |||
03
18.06.2019
24.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | |||
04
19.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Glycom A/S Kogle Allé 4 2970 Hørsholm / DK Opponent's representative AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | |||
05
19.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2019/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | 08.07.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.01.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.11.2020 | 19.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.08.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 25.10.2021 | Appeal received No. T1945/21 | 22.10.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 22.12.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2014 | AL | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MK | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | RS | 19.09.2018 | SE | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SM | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | LU | 20.01.2019 | MT | 20.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.01.2014 | |
AL | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
MT | 20.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
MT | 20.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
MT | 20.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 20.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2479263 (JENNEWEIN BIOTECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * page 10, paragraph 98 - page 11, paragraph 103 ** paragraph [0052] *; | [Y] - ALBERMANN C ET AL, "Synthesis of the milk oligosaccharide 2'-fucosyllactose using recombinant bacterial enzymes", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, PERGAMON, GB, (20010823), vol. 334, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0008-6215(01)00177-X, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 97 - 103, XP004298614 [Y] 1-12 * page 102, paragraph 1 - column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(01)00177-X | Examination | WO2012092160 | WO2012112777 | WO2013025104 | EP2857410 | - Wataru Sumiyoshi ET AL, "Determination of each neutral oligosaccharide in the milk of Japanese women during the course of lactation", British Journal of Nutrition, (20030101), vol. 89, no. 01, doi:10.1079/BJN2002746, ISSN 0007-1145, pages 61 - 69, XP055199354 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1079/BJN2002746 | by applicant | WO2010115935 | - SAMAIN ET AL., "Production of O-acetylated and sulfated chitooligosaccharides by recombinant Escherichia coli strains harboring different combinations of nod genes.", J. BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 72, pages 33 - 47 | Opposition | EP2379708 | WO2012069415 | EP2479263 | WO2012122777 | EP2526784 | WO2013182206 | EP2857410 | US2016333042 | WO2012112777 | WO2012160080 | WO2015106943 | JPS61271296 | US6017433 | EP2013367 | US2010248315 | EP2896628 | WO0024918 | US6454946 | US2005069997 | US2005211240 | CN101691538 | WO2011016008 | EP2013367 | WO2011150939 | WO2013185780 | WO2015150328 | EP3141610 | - "Chapter 1 - Introduction", A. BRAITHWAITE et al., Chromatographic Methods, 4th ed., (19850000), pages 1 - 7, XP055612094 | - "WHO Expert Committee on Specifications for Pharmaceutical Preparations", WHO Technical Report Series, (19990000), pages 1 - 168, URL: http://apps.who.int/medicinedocs/en/d/Jh1792e/18.2.4. 2.html#Jh1792e.18.2.4.2 | - Yu et al., "The principal fucosylated oligosaccharides of human milk exhibit prebiotic properties on cultured infant microbiota", Glycobiology, (20130000), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 169 - 177, XP055275362 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/glycob/cws138 | - "Chromatography", JOHN MCMURRY, ORGANIC CHEMISTRY. 6th Ed., Thomson, (20040000), pages 415 - 416, XP055615824 | - "Chapter 1: Fermentation Technology", STANBURY PF et al, MOLECULAR BIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, Royal Society of Chemistry, (20070000), pages 1 - 24, XP055615822 | - "Sorbents for Chromatography", J D SEADER et al., Separation Process Principles, CHEMICAL AND BIOCHEMICAL OPERATIONS. 3rd Ed., John Wiley & Sons, (20100000), pages 577 - 578, XP055615828 | - T. BUTTLER et al., "Characterization of a sampling unit based on tangential flow filtration for on- line bioprocess monitoring", Analytica Chimica Acta, (19930000), vol. 279, doi:10.1016/0003-2670(93)85063-P, pages 27 - 37, XP026594665 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2670(93)85063-P | - EZURE Y. et al., "Manufacturing High Purity Maltose and Maltotetraose from Starch by a Novel and Efficient Procedure Named “Reducing End Modification Method", Biosci. Biotech. Biochem., (19970100), vol. 61, no. 11, pages 1931 - 1933, XP055615831 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.61.1931 | - Anonymous, "Chromatography", Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia, (20190610), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Chromatography, (20190613), XP055615906 | - Anonymous, "Electrodialysis", Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia, (20140106), URL: https ://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Electrodialvsis&oldid=589414103, (20190619), XP055615910 | - WANG et al., "Demineralization of soybean oligosaccharides extract from sweet slurry by conventional electrodialysis", Journal of Food Engineering, (20090606), vol. 95, no. 3, pages 410 - 415, XP026467145 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jfoodeng.2009.05.024 | - ARTEAGA-CABELLO et al., "Synthesis of 2- FL and LDFT by metabolically engineered E. coli through the fkp gene from Bacteroides fragilis", Program and abstracts for the 2011 Meeting of the Society for Glycobiology / Glycobiology, vol. 2, no. 11, (20111100), page 1499, URL: https://academic.oup.com/glycob/article/21/11/1454/1987828, XP055616744 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/glycob/cwr126 | - DROUILLARD et al., "Large-Scale Synthesis of H-Antigen Oligosaccharides by Expressing Helicobacter pylori alpha- 1,2-Fucosyltransferase in Metabolically Engineered Escherichia coli Cells", Angewandte Chemie International Edition, (20060214), vol. 45, no. 11, pages 1778 - 1780, XP055105681 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200503427 | - LEVISON, P. R., "Techniques in Process-Scale Ion-Exchange Chromatography", LEVISON, P. R., G. Ganetsos, P.E. Barker, Preparative and Production Scale Chromatography, Marcel Dekker, Inc., (19930000), vol. 61, pages 2pp, 617 - 620, XP055616756 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1201/9780367811150-31 | - Jennewein Biotechnologie Gmbh, "GRAS Notification for T-Fucosyllactose (T-FL)", GRAS Notice (GRN) No. 571, (20150301), pages 000001-000021, 000282 - 000301, URL: http://wayback.archive-it.org/7993/20171031041333/https://www.fda.gov/downloads/Food/IngredientsPackagingLabeling/GRAS/NoticeInventory/UCM461885.pdf, XP055618524 | - STOCK, R et al., Chromatographic Methods, New York, John Wiley & Sons, Inc.,, (19740000), pages 1-23, 26-31, 40 - 51, XP055618540 | - FARRELL, S et al., "Exploring the potential of electrodialysis", Chemical Engineering Education, (20031200), vol. 37, no. 1, pages 52 - 59, XP055618502 | - Anonymous, "Product Information Lewatit® S 6368 A", Lanxess, (20111013), pages 1 - 4, XP055618553 | - Anonymous, "Product Information Lewatit® S 2568", Lanxess, (20090818), pages 1 - 4, XP055618554 | - BAUMGARTNER, F et al., "Construction of Escherichia coli strains with chromosomally integrated expression cassettes for the synthesis of 2′-fucosyllac", Microbial Cell Factories, (20130000), vol. 12, page 40, XP021151035 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-2859-12-40 | - "Chapter 1 - Introduction", A. Braithwaite, F.J. Smith, Chromatographic Methods, 4th ed., (19850101), pages 1 - 7, XP055612094 | - "Techniques in Process-Scale Ion-Exchange Chromatography", Levison, P. R., Preparative and Production Scale Chromatography, Marcel Dekker, Inc. , (19930101), pages 617 - 620, doi:10.1201/9780367811150-31, XP055616756 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1201/9780367811150-31 | - Farrell, S Et Al., "Exploring the potential of electrodialysis", Chemical Engineering Education, (20031201), vol. 37, no. 1, pages 52 - 59, XP055618502 | - "Chapter 1: Fermentation Technology", Stanbury P.F., et al., MOLECULAR BIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, Royal Society of Chemistry , (20070101), pages 1 - 24, XP055615822 | - Yohji Ezure, Shigeaki Maruo, Masahiko Kojima, Tomonori Sakai, Hirofumi Yamamoto, Noriyuki Tachikake, Hirotsugu Ogawa, Masaya Toda, "Manufacturing High Purity Maltose and Maltotetraose from Starch by a Novel and Efficient Procedure Named “Reducing End Modification Method”", Bioscience, Biotechnology, and Biochemistry, JP , (19970101), vol. 61, no. 11, doi:10.1271/bbb.61.1931, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 1931 - 1933, XP055615831 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.61.1931 | - Wang, Q. ; Ying, T. ; Jiang, T. ; Yang, D. ; Jahangir, M.M., "Demineralization of soybean oligosaccharides extract from sweet slurry by conventional electrodialysis", Journal of Food Engineering, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20091201), vol. 95, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.jfoodeng.2009.05.024, ISSN 0260-8774, pages 410 - 415, XP026467145 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jfoodeng.2009.05.024 | - "Effective ion exchange for challenging water-treatment needs", URL: https://www.dupont.com/water/technologies/ion-exchange-ix.html | - "Chapter 1 - Chromatography principles and process development", Ge Healthcare Life Sciences, Multimodal Chromatography Handbook, (20131101), pages 3 - 15, XP093008403 | - NEWBURG et al., "Human Milk Oligosaccharides and Synthetic Galactosyloligosaccharides Contain 3'-, 4-, and 6'-Galactosyllactose and Attenuate Inflammation in Human T84, NCM-460, and H4 Cells and Intestinal Tissue Ex Vivo", J Nutr., (20160200), vol. 146, no. 2, doi:10.3945/jn.115.220749, pages 358 - 67, XP055632669 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3945/jn.115.220749 | - Paulina Urrutia, Barbara Rodriguez-Colinas, Lucia Fernandez-Arrojo, Antonio O. Ballesteros, Lorena Wilson, Andres Illanes, Francisco J. Plou, "Detailed Analysis of Galactooligosaccharides Synthesis with B-Galactosidase from Aspergillus oryzae", Journal of Agricultural and Food Chemistry, US , (20130206), vol. 61, no. 5, doi:10.1021/jf304354u, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 1081 - 1087, XP055706491 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf304354u | - Fakhreddin Salehi, "Current and future applications for nanofiltration technology in the food processing", FOOD AND BIOPRODUCTS PROCESSING, GB , (20140401), vol. 92, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.fbp.2013.09.005, ISSN 0960-3085, pages 161 - 177, XP055369772 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fbp.2013.09.005 | - Robert J. Linhardt, Helene G. Bazin, "Separation and Purification of Carbohydrates", Glycoscience: Chemistry and Chemical Biology I-III, Berlin, Heidelberg , Springer Berlin Heidelberg , (20010101), pages 63 - 74, doi:10.1007/978-3-642-56874-9_3, ISBN 978-3-642-56874-9, XP055706476 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-56874-9_3 | - "Downstream Process Technology: An Overview", Krishna Kant Prasad, et al., Downstream Process Technology: A New Horizon In Biotechnology, PH Learning , (20100101), pages 3 - 15, XP055706479 | - "Chapter 18", Rehm H-J, et al., Biotechnology, 2nd ed., VCH , (19930101), pages 469 - 503, XP055706495 | - Perola O. Magalhaes et al, "Methods of Endotoxin Removal from Biological Preparations: a Review", JOURNAL OF PHARMACY AND PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, CA , (20070518), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 1482-1826, pages 388 - 404, XP007913761 | - "Chapter 4", Karp Angela, et al., Molecular Tools for Screening Biodiversity, Plants and Animals, CHAPMAN & HALL , (19980101), pages 53 - 59, XP055706481 |