EP2782090 - Pixel circuits for amoled displays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ignis Innovation Inc. 50 Bathurst Drive, Unit 12 Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2C5 / CA | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Azizi, Yaser 558 Box Grove Place Waterloo, Ontario N2L 4V3 / CA | 02 /
Chaji, Gholamreza 463 Kelso Drive Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2S3 / CA | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/47] |
Former [2014/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14157112.5 | 28.02.2014 | [2014/39] | Priority number, date | US201313789978 | 08.03.2013 Original published format: US201313789978 | [2014/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2782090 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2782090 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
G09G3/3258 (US);
H05B45/14 (US);
G09G2300/0819 (US);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0295 (EP,US);
G09G2320/045 (EP,US);
G09G2320/048 (US);
G09G2320/0693 (EP,US);
G09G2320/10 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2014/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Pixelschaltungen für Amoledanzeigen | [2014/39] | English: | Pixel circuits for amoled displays | [2014/39] | French: | Circuits de pixels pour écrans AMOLED | [2014/39] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18205133.4 / EP3471083 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2014 | AL | 21.11.2018 | AT | 21.11.2018 | CY | 21.11.2018 | CZ | 21.11.2018 | DK | 21.11.2018 | EE | 21.11.2018 | ES | 21.11.2018 | FI | 21.11.2018 | HR | 21.11.2018 | IT | 21.11.2018 | LT | 21.11.2018 | LV | 21.11.2018 | MC | 21.11.2018 | MK | 21.11.2018 | NL | 21.11.2018 | PL | 21.11.2018 | RO | 21.11.2018 | RS | 21.11.2018 | SE | 21.11.2018 | SI | 21.11.2018 | SK | 21.11.2018 | SM | 21.11.2018 | TR | 21.11.2018 | BG | 21.02.2019 | NO | 21.02.2019 | GR | 22.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | FR | 28.02.2019 | GB | 28.02.2019 | IE | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | LU | 28.02.2019 | MT | 28.02.2019 | IS | 21.03.2019 | PT | 21.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.02.2014 | |
AL | 21.11.2018 | ||
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 21.11.2018 | |
NO | 21.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008315788 (LEVEY CHARLES I [US], et al) [I] 1-17* paragraphs [0039] - [0047]; figures 2,4 *; | [I]US2009295423 (LEVEY CHARLES I [US]) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0042] - [0046]; figures 1-4 *; | [I]EP2133860 (SAMSUNG MOBILE DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0073] - [0082]; figures 3, 7A-7B,8A-8C *; | [I]US2010103159 (LEON FELIPE A [US]) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0044] - [0049]; figures 3,5 *; | [I]US2010103082 (LEVEY CHARLES I [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0042] - [0052]; figures 2,4 *; | [I]US2011205250 (YOO MYOUNG-HWAN [KR], et al) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0131] - [0185]; figures 3-9 *; | [I]EP2383720 (IGNIS INNOVATION INC [CA]) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0106] - [0162]; figures 8,12,13,14 *; | [I]US2012299978 (CHAJI GHOLAMREZA [CA]) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0085] , [0086] , [0099] , [0100]; figures 5A-6D * |