EP2775053 - Urinal with sanitation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toto Ltd. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Yusuke c/o TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 02 /
ARAKI, Yusuke c/o TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 03 /
TOYODA, Koichi c/o TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 04 /
ITAMI, Aiko c/o TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 05 /
YAMAMOTO, Masahiro c/o TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 06 /
TAKESHITA, Akemi c/o TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 07 /
KAMESHIGE, Hiroyuki c/o TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Uchida, Kenji, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [2014/37] | Application number, filing date | 14158021.7 | 06.03.2014 | [2014/37] | Priority number, date | JP20130044760 | 06.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013044760 | [2014/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2775053 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E03D13/00, E03D5/10, E03D9/03, E03D9/02, E03D9/00 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
E03D5/105 (EP,US);
E03D13/005 (US);
E03D13/00 (EP,US);
E03D13/007 (EP,US);
E03D9/002 (EP,US);
E03D9/005 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Urinal mit Hygienevorrichtung | [2014/37] | English: | Urinal with sanitation device | [2014/37] | French: | Urinoir avec dispositif d'assainissement | [2014/37] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 13.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01284628 (TOTO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH03183832 (INAX CORP) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0597286 (LEPEL BARBARA [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 3; figures 1-3; claim 5 * * page 1, line 36 - line 42 *; | [A]JPH10237923 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2005299092 (TOTO LTD) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]JP2006009556 (TOTO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [YD]JP2007518005 (FALCON WATERFREE TECHNOLOGIES, HIGGINS M) [YD] 1-15 * figure - * | by applicant | JP2007518005 |