EP2784874 - Broadband monopole antenna for vehicles for two frequency bands separated by a frequency gap in the decimeter wavelength [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Deutschland GmbH Delphiplatz 1 42119 Wuppertal / DE | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindenmeier, Stefan Eulenweg 9 82131 Gauting-Buchendorf / DE | 02 /
Lindenmeier, Heinz Fürstenrieder Strasse 7b 82152 Planegg / DE | 03 /
Hopf, Jochen Salmdorfer Strasse 3a 85540 Haar / DE | 04 /
Reiter, Leopold Ludwig-Thoma-Strasse 9 82205 Gilching / DE | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14159092.7 | 12.03.2014 | [2014/40] | Priority number, date | DE20131005001 | 24.03.2013 Original published format: DE102013005001 | [2014/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2784874 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2784874 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2784874 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/32, H01Q5/00, H01Q9/36, H01Q9/40 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
H01Q1/3275 (EP,US);
H01Q1/27 (US);
H01Q5/321 (EP,US);
H01Q9/36 (EP,US);
H01Q9/40 (EP,US);
H01Q9/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2014/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Breitband-Monopolantenne für zwei durch eine Frequenzlücke getrennte Frequenzbänder im Dezimeterwellenbereich für Fahrzeuge | [2014/40] | English: | Broadband monopole antenna for vehicles for two frequency bands separated by a frequency gap in the decimeter wavelength | [2014/40] | French: | Antenne monopôle à large bande pour deux bandes de fréquences séparées par un écart de fréquence dans la plage d'ondes décimétriques pour des véhicules | [2014/40] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 28.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2014 | AL | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | ES | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | HR | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | MK | 20.07.2016 | MT | 20.07.2016 | NL | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | RS | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | SM | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | IE | 12.03.2017 | LU | 12.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 12.03.2014 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 12.03.2014 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.03.2014 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0350364 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [Y] 8 * columns 1-2 * * figure 1 * [A] 1; | [Y]WO9624963 (MEGAWAVE CORP [US]) [Y] 5 * pages 10-12 * * figures 4-8 *; | [YA]US2002109643 (BUCKLES RONALD L [US]) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0011] - [0020] * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1; | [XY]WO03034538 (FRACTUS SA [ES], et al) [X] 1-4,12-14 * pages 3-13 * * figures 1-16 * [Y] 5-8,11,15; | [YA]EP1372216 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0007] * * figure 39 *[A] 1; | [XY]JP2005057438 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,2,4,12 * abstract * [Y] 5-8,11,15; | [YA]US2010265147 (WAKUI MASASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 7,11 * paragraphs [0151] - [0155] * * figures 1-7 * [A] 1; | [YA]EP2479839 (INFAC ELECS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0030] * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1; | [YA]DE102012003460 (LINDENMEIER HEINZ [DE]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0010] , [0015] , [0016] * * figures 1,6,7 * [A] 1,7,9; | [A] - MCKENZIE A J ET AL, "Dual-Frequency Operation of a Loaded Vertical Medium-Frequency Radiator", IRE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCAST TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS,, (19551201), vol. PGBTS-2, pages 35 - 42, XP001382259 [A] 1,2,4,12 * the whole document * | [YA] - PALUD S ET AL, "A tactical broadband omnidirectional antenna", MICROWAVE CONFERENCE, 2008. APMC 2008. ASIA-PACIFIC, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081216), ISBN 978-1-4244-2641-6, pages 1 - 4, XP031637049 [Y] 8 * the whole document * [A] 1 |