EP2782246 - Pseudo-envelope following power management system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qorvo US, Inc. 7628 Thorndike Road Greensboro, NC 27409 / US | [2017/17] |
Former [2014/39] | For all designated states RF Micro Devices, Inc. 7628 Thorndike Road Greensboro, NC 27409 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Khlat, Nadim 24 rue Pierre de Fermat F-31270 Cugnaux Midi-Pyrenees / FR | 02 /
Kay, Michael, R. 5237 Creed Drive Summerfield, NC North Carolina 27358 / US | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/24] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2014/39] | Keane, Paul Fachtna FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 14162658.0 | 19.04.2011 | [2014/39] | Priority number, date | US20100325659P | 19.04.2010 Original published format: US 325659 P | [2014/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2782246 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2782246 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/02, H02M3/07, H03F3/189, H03F3/24 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
H03F1/0244 (EP,US);
H03F1/0238 (US);
H03F1/025 (EP,US);
H03F3/189 (EP,US);
H03F3/19 (EP,US);
H03F3/21 (EP,US);
H03F3/24 (EP,US);
H03G3/004 (EP,US);
H02M3/07 (EP,US);
H03F2200/102 (EP,US);
H03F2200/375 (EP,US);
H03F2200/451 (EP,US);
H03F2200/555 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2014/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Energieverwaltungssystem mit Pseudo-Hüllkurvenfolger | [2014/39] | English: | Pseudo-envelope following power management system | [2014/39] | French: | Système de gestion d'alimentation de suivi de pseudo-enveloppe | [2014/39] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 29.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11720630.0 / EP2561611 | Divisional application(s) | EP18170526.0 / EP3376667 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20110720630) is 16.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2011 | AL | 13.06.2018 | AT | 13.06.2018 | CY | 13.06.2018 | CZ | 13.06.2018 | DK | 13.06.2018 | EE | 13.06.2018 | ES | 13.06.2018 | FI | 13.06.2018 | HR | 13.06.2018 | IT | 13.06.2018 | LT | 13.06.2018 | LV | 13.06.2018 | MC | 13.06.2018 | MK | 13.06.2018 | MT | 13.06.2018 | NL | 13.06.2018 | PL | 13.06.2018 | RO | 13.06.2018 | RS | 13.06.2018 | SE | 13.06.2018 | SI | 13.06.2018 | SK | 13.06.2018 | SM | 13.06.2018 | TR | 13.06.2018 | BG | 13.09.2018 | NO | 13.09.2018 | GR | 14.09.2018 | IS | 13.10.2018 | PT | 15.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 19.04.2011 | |
AL | 13.06.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
MT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.04.2011 | |
AL | 13.06.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5414614 (FETTE BRUCE A [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 4; figure 1 ** column 4, line 5 - column 6, line 60 *; | [X]US6055168 (KOTOWSKI JEFF [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 3, line 2 - column 4, line 12 * * column 5, line 14 - column 8, line 31; figures 3,4,8 *; | [X]US6198645 (KOTOWSKI JEFF [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 1, lines 13-16 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 9 * * column 4, line 28 - column 6, line 3 * * figures 1,2 * |