Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2774925

EP2774925 - Heterocyclic modulators of ATP-binding cassette transporters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/37]Pharmaceutical composition containing a heterocyclic modulator of ATP-binding cassette transporters
[2016/03]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2017No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.12.2017  [2017/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
50 Northern Avenue
Boston, MA 02210 / US
[2016/52]
Former [2014/37]For all designated states
Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
50 Northern Avenue
Boston, MA 02210 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hadida Ruah, Sarah
2356 Torrey Pines 16
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
02 / Hamilton, Matthew
24 Mockingbird Road
Hackettstown, NJ 07840 / US
03 / Miller, Mark
5075 La Jolla Blvd., 9
San Diego, CA 92109 / US
04 / Grootenhuis, Peter D. J.
4801 Riding Ridge Road
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
05 / Bear, Brian
5108 Spencer Ct.
Oceanside, CA 92057 / US
06 / McCarthy, Jason
2274 Carol View Drive Apt. 112
Cardiff By The Sea, CA 92007 / US
07 / Zhou, Jinglan
4466 Shorepointe Way
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)Oates, Edward Christopher , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/45]
Former [2014/44]Goodfellow, Hugh Robin , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2014/37]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date14163968.208.11.2006
[2014/37]
Priority number, dateUS20050734506P08.11.2005         Original published format: US 734506 P
US20050754086P27.12.2005         Original published format: US 754086 P
US20060802458P22.05.2006         Original published format: US 802458 P
[2014/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2774925
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2774925
Date:28.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07D405/12, A61K31/443, A61P11/00
[2014/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/52]
Former [2014/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Heterocyclische Modulatoren von ATP-bindenden Kassettentransportern[2016/03]
English:Heterocyclic modulators of ATP-binding cassette transporters[2016/03]
French:Modulateurs hétérocycliques de transporteurs à cassette liant l'ATP[2016/03]
Former [2014/37]Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung mit einem heterocyclischen Modulator ATP-bindender Kassettentransporter
Former [2014/37]Pharmaceutical composition containing a heterocyclic modulator of ATP-binding cassette transporters
Former [2014/37]Composition pharmaceutique contenant un modulateur hétérocyclique de transporteurs à cassette liant l'ATP
Examination procedure04.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/16]
27.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2016Fee for grant paid
16.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06837028.7  / EP1945632
EP10192912.3  / EP2395002
Divisional application(s)EP16205718.6  / EP3208272
Opposition(s)29.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
09.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
09.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
09.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
09.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2017/22]
Former [2017/12]LV28.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2005075435  (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * claim 1; compound 245 *
by applicantUS6099562
 US5886026
 US5304121
    - GREGORY, R. J. ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 347, pages 382 - 386
    - RICH, D. P. ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 347, pages 358 - 362
    - RIORDAN, J. R. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 245, pages 1 066 - 1 073
    - CUTTING, G. R. ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 346, pages 366 - 369
    - DEAN, M. ET AL., CELL, (1990), vol. 61, pages 863 - 870
    - KEREM, B-S. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 245, pages 1073 - 1080
    - KEREM, B-S ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 8447 - 8451
    - QUINTON, P. M., FASEB J., (1990), vol. 4, pages 2709 - 2727
    - DALEMANS ET AL., NATURE LOND., (1991), vol. 354, pages 526 - 528
    - PASYK; FOSKETT, J. CELL. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 12347 - 50
    - ARIDOR M ET AL., NATURE MED., (1999), vol. 5, no. 7, pages 745 - 751
    - SHASTRY, B.S. ET AL., NEUROCHEM. INTERNATIONAL, (2003), vol. 43, pages 1 - 7
    - RUTISHAUSER, J. ET AL., SWISS MED WKLY, (2002), vol. 132, pages 211 - 222
    - MORELLO, JP ET AL., TIPS, (2000), vol. 21, pages 466 - 469
    - BROSS P. ET AL., HUMAN MUT., (1999), vol. 14, pages 186 - 198
    - HWANG, T. C. ET AL., J. GEN. PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 111, no. 3, pages 477 - 90
    - Handbook of Chemistry and Physics
    - FREIREICH ET AL., CANCER CHEMOTHER. REP, (1966), vol. 50, page 219
    - Scientific Tables, Geigy Pharmaceuticals, ARDSLEY, (1970), page 537
    - S. M. BERGE ET AL., "pharmaceutically acceptable salts in detail", J. PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19
    - GONZALEZ, J. E.; R. Y. TSIEN, "Voltage sensing by fluorescence resonance energy transfer in single cells", BIOPHYS J, (1995), vol. 69, no. 4, pages 1272 - 80, XP000961694
    - GONZALEZ, J. E.; R. Y. TSIEN, "Improved indicators of cell membrane potential that use fluorescence resonance energy transfer", CHEM BIOL, (1997), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/S1074-5521(97)90070-3, pages 269 - 77, XP000961796

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(97)90070-3
    - GONZALEZ, J. E., K. OADES ET AL., "Cell-based assays and instrumentation for screening ion-channel targets", DRUG DISCOV TODAY, (1999), vol. 4, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1016/S1359-6446(99)01383-5, pages 431 - 439, XP001026838

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(99)01383-5
    - GONZALEZ, J. E.; K. OADES ET AL., "Cell-based assays and instrumentation for screening ion-channel targets", DRUG DISCOV TODAY, (1999), vol. 4, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1016/S1359-6446(99)01383-5, pages 431 - 439, XP001026838

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(99)01383-5