EP2756755 - Bedbug detection, monitoring and control techniques [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borth, Paul W. 10255 Fox Trace Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | 02 /
Orr, Nailah 10899 Weston Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 03 /
Scherer, Peter N. 575 North 500 West Lebanon, IN 46052 / US | 04 /
Sshneider, Brian M. 75 Red Oak Lane Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 05 /
Tolley, Mike P. 8611 Shoal Creek Lane Indianapolis, IN 46234 / US | 06 /
Vogelwede, Christopher J. 9660 N County Road 650 East Pittsboro, IN 46167 / US | 07 /
Crouse, Gary D. 5069 East 146th Street Noblesville, IN 46062 / US | 08 /
McCaskill, David G. 135 Plymouth Rock Court Greenwood, IN 46142 / US | 09 /
Yau, Kerrm Y. 14482 Balwin Lane Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 10 /
Olberding, Edward L. 4887 Willow Ridge Court Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | 11 /
Demark, Joseph J. 14269 Chariots Whisper Drive Westfield, IN 46074 / US | 12 /
Fisher, Marc L. 1115 Arrington Road Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | [2014/37] |
Former [2014/30] | 01 /
Borth, Paul W. 10255 Fox Trace Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | ||
02 /
Orr, Nailah 10899 Weston Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | |||
03 /
Scherer, Peter N. 575 North 500 West Lebanon, IN 46052 / US | |||
04 /
Sshneider, Brian M. 75 Red Oak Lane Carmel, IN 46033 / US | |||
05 /
Tolley, Mike P. 8611 Shoal Creek Lane Indianapolis, IN 46234 / US | |||
06 /
Vogelwede, Christopher J. 5315 Newcastle Road Lafayette, IN 47905 / US | |||
07 /
Crouse, Gary D. 5069 East 146th Street Noblesville, IN 46062 / US | |||
08 /
McCaskill, David G. 135 Plymouth Rock Court Greenwood, IN 46142 / US | |||
09 /
Yau, Kerrm Y. 14482 Balwin Lane Carmel, IN 46032 / US | |||
10 /
Olberding, Edward L. 4887 Willow Ridge Court Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | |||
11 /
Demark, Joseph J. 14269 Chariots Whisper Drive Westfield, IN 46074 / US | |||
12 /
Fisher, Marc L. 1115 Arrington Road Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 14164104.3 | 22.10.2007 | [2014/30] | Priority number, date | US20060853573P | 23.10.2006 Original published format: US 853573 P | US20060854378P | 25.10.2006 Original published format: US 854378 P | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2756755 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2756755 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2756755 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/00, G01N33/569, G01N33/68, A01M1/20, A01M1/02, G08B21/18 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
A01M1/2011 (EP,US);
A01M1/02 (EP,US);
A01M1/103 (EP,US);
A01M1/2022 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (EP,US);
G08B21/18 (US);
Y10S436/815 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [2015/17] |
Former [2014/30] | ES, FR, IT | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erkennung, Überwachung und Kontrolle von Bettwanzen. | [2018/18] | English: | Bedbug detection, monitoring and control techniques | [2014/30] | French: | Techniques de détection, de surveillance et de contrôle des parasites de literie. | [2018/18] |
Former [2014/31] | Verfahren zur Erkennung, Überwachung und Kontrolle von Bettwanzen | ||
Former [2014/31] | Techniques de détection, de surveillance et de contrôle des parasites de literie | Examination procedure | 11.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 23.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 30.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07852871.8 / EP2076118 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4157629 (PARKS JAMES R [US]) [X] 15* column 3; figure 1 *; | [X]US2003184442 (GARDNER JAMES P [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X] - VALENZUELA J G ET AL, "Purification and cloning of the salivary nitrophorin from the hemipteran Cimex lectularius.", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY SEP 1998 LNKD- PUBMED:9716517, (199809), vol. 201, no. Pt 18, ISSN 0022-0949, pages 2659 - 2664, XP002588471 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | [X] - VALENZUELA J G ET AL, "A Salivary Nitrophorin (Nitric-oxide-carrying hemoprotein) in the bedbud Cimex Lectularius", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, COMPANY OF BIOLOGISTS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (19950701), vol. 198, no. 7, ISSN 0022-0949, pages 1519 - 1526, XP008108609 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | Examination | US4212129 | US5044112 | US5142815 | DE29816743U | US6502347 | US2004200129 | GB2420957 |