EP2950174 - Method and Apparatus for safely monitoring the state of two devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dold, Franz Albert-Fehrenbach-Weg 29 78120 Furtwangen / DE | 02 /
Saumer, Markus Schwalbenweg 5 77948 Friesenheim / DE | 03 /
Kunz, Martin Alemannenstraße 88 79117 Freiburg / DE | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | Ludewigt, Christoph Sick AG Intellectual Property Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | Application number, filing date | 14169788.8 | 26.05.2014 | [2015/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2950174 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418, G05B19/05, G05B19/042, G05B9/02, H01H47/00 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
G05B9/02 (EP,US);
G05B19/0428 (EP,US);
G05B19/058 (EP,US);
G05B19/4184 (EP,US);
G05B2219/15037 (EP,US);
G05B2219/24208 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] |
Former [2015/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum sicheren Überprüfen eines Zustandes zweier Einrichtungen | [2015/49] | English: | Method and Apparatus for safely monitoring the state of two devices | [2015/49] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour surveiller en toute sécurité l'état de deux dispositifs | [2015/49] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 18.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/34] | 12.01.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.07.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/34] | Appeal following examination | 14.02.2017 | Appeal received No. T1156/17 | 27.04.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.07.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | 16.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE102011016137 (PILZ GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0105] *; | [I]EP2017869 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0066] *; | [A]EP2720094 (SICK AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |