EP2949925 - Power-generating updraft power plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiwerath, Constant 77, rue J.-F. Kenndey 3249 Bettembourg / LU | For all designated states Wiesen, Jörg Bahnhofstrasse 51 66620 Nonnweiler/Otzenhausen / DE | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 14170685.3 | 30.05.2014 | [2015/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2949925 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F03D9/00, F03D1/04 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
F03D9/37 (EP,US);
F03D1/04 (EP);
F03D9/007 (EP);
F05B2220/7066 (EP);
F05B2240/131 (EP);
F05B2260/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] |
Former [2015/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stromerzeugendes Aufwindkraftwerk | [2015/49] | English: | Power-generating updraft power plant | [2015/49] | French: | Centrale électrique solaire à effet cheminée | [2015/49] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 10.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4491740 (SIEGEL EDWARD A [US]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract ** column 2, line 21 - line 65 *; | [A]DE3636248 (BUELK EGGERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 33 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2010275598 (RAFFAELE PETER ROBERT [AU], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0066] * * figure 6 *; | [A]WO2010137530 (SEC CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * the whole document * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2011173980 (YANGPICHIT PITAYA [TH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0035] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | US3436908 | US4491740 | EP1741927 |