EP2824183 - Methods for producing bispecific antibodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/03] | Antibody substituting for function of blood coagulation factor VIII | ||
[2019/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP | [2015/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kojima, Tetsuo c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | 02 /
Hattori, Kunihiro c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | 03 /
Soeda, Tetsuhiro c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | 04 /
Miyazaki, Taro c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | 05 /
Saito, Hiroyuki c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/31] |
Former [2015/03] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14176527.1 | 31.03.2006 | [2015/03] | Priority number, date | JP20050112514 | 08.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005112514 | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2824183 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2824183 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
C07K16/36 (US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/468 (US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/75 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/03] | C12N15/09, A61K39/395, A61P7/04, C07K16/40, C07K16/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2015/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung bispezifischer Antikörper | [2019/45] | English: | Methods for producing bispecific antibodies | [2019/45] | French: | Procédé pour la production d'anticorps bispécifiques | [2019/45] |
Former [2015/03] | Antikörperersatz für Blutgerinnungsfaktor VIII | ||
Former [2015/03] | Antibody substituting for function of blood coagulation factor VIII | ||
Former [2015/03] | Substitution des anticorps de la fonction du facteur VIII de coagulation sanguine | Examination procedure | 13.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 16.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06730769.4 / EP1876236 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2006 | AT | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | CZ | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | ES | 29.07.2020 | FI | 29.07.2020 | IT | 29.07.2020 | LT | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | NL | 29.07.2020 | PL | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | SE | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SK | 29.07.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | PT | 30.11.2020 | BE | 31.03.2021 | IE | 31.03.2021 | LU | 31.03.2021 | [2023/27] |
Former [2023/24] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9607754 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * pages 1-5 * * pages 54-60 *; | [XI]WO9850431 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [X] 3,6,9 * abstract * [I] 1,2,4,5,7,8; | [XI]US2002062010 (ARATHOON W ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 3,6,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0028]; figure 1C; example 4; claims 1-27 * [I] 1,2,4,5,7,8; | [XI]WO2004009618 (CRUCELL HOLLAND BV [NL], et al) [X] 3,6,9 * abstract * * page 21; figures 5, 6; examples 1, 2, 4, 7, 9; claims 1-54 * [I] 1,2,4,5,7,8; | [XI]WO2004065611 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 3,6,9 * abstract * [I] 1,2,4,5,7,8; | [XI]WO2004111233 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 3,6,9 * abstract * [I] 1,2,4,5,7,8; | [XPI]EP1605058 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 3,6,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0 24] - [0025] - [0 30] , [0 37] - [0042]; figure 2; claims 1-10 * [I] 1,2,4,5,7,8; | [XI] - MERCHANT A MARGARET ET AL, "An efficient route to human bispecific IgG", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19980701), vol. 16, no. 7, doi:10.1038/NBT0798-677, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 677 - 681, XP002141015 [X] 3,6,9 * the whole document * * in particular abstract, Figure 1, page 679-680* [I] 1,2,4,5,7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0798-677 | [XI] - CARTER PAUL, "Bispecific human IgG by design", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010101), vol. 248, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0022-1759(00)00339-2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 7 - 15, XP002974199 [X] 3,6,9 * the whole document * * in particular abstract, page 10 * [I] 1,2,4,5,7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(00)00339-2 | [A] - FIGINI M ET AL, "In Vitro Assembly of Repertoires of Antibody Chains on the Surface of Phage by Renaturation", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, vol. 239, no. 1, doi:10.1006/JMBI.1994.1351, ISSN 0022-2836, (19940526), pages 68 - 78, (19940526), XP024009507 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1994.1351 | [A] - VAUGHAN T J ET AL, "HUMAN ANTIBODIES WITH SUB-NANOMOLAR AFFINITIES ISOLATED FROM A LARGE NON-IMMUNIZED PHAGE DISPLAY LIBRARY", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19960301), vol. 14, doi:10.1038/NBT0396-309, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 309 - 314, XP000196144 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0396-309 | Examination | WO2004097041 | - JIRHOLT P ET AL, "Exploiting sequence space: shuffling in vivo formed complementarity determining regions into a master framework", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980701), vol. 215, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0378-1119(98)00317-5, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 471 - 476, XP004149272 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(98)00317-5 | by applicant | US3773919 | EP0058481 | EP0133988 | EP0239400 | US4945050 | EP0404097 | WO9203918 | WO9311161 | WO9312227 | WO9317706 | WO9402602 | WO9425585 | WO9602576 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | WO9951743 | - MERTENS K ET AL., THROMB. HAEMOST., (1999), vol. 82, pages 209 - 217 | - LAPAN KA ET AL., THROMB. HAEMOST., (1998), vol. 80, pages 418 - 422 | - SEGAL DM ET AL., JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (2001), vol. 248, pages 1 - 6 | - HOLLIGER, P. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315 | - MILSTEIN C ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, pages 537 - 540 | - RIDGWAY JB ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1996), vol. 9, pages 617 - 621 | - MERCHANT AM ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, pages 677 - 681 | - KELER T ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 57, pages 4008 - 4014 | - BRENNAN M ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 81 - 83 | - KOSTELNY SA ET AL., J. OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 53 | - HOLLIGER P ET AL., PROC NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - KIPRIYANOV SM ET AL., J. OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 293, pages 41 - 56 | - ZHU Z ET AL., PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 6, pages 781 - 788 | - MALLENDER WD ET AL., J. OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 269, pages 199 - 206 | - SATO K ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, pages 851 - 856 | - "An efficient route to human bispecific IgG", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, pages 677 - 681 | - NILSSON 1M ET AL., J. INTERN. MED., (1992), vol. 235, pages 25 - 32 | - L6FQVIST T ET AL., J. INTERN. MED., (1997), vol. 241, pages 395 - 400 | - LANGER ET AL., J. BIOMED. MATER. RES., (1981), vol. 15, pages 267 - 277 | - LANGER, CHEMTECH, (1982), vol. 12, pages 98 - 105 | - SIDMAN ET AL., BIOPOLYMERS, (1983), vol. 22, pages 547 - 556 | - KREBBER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1997), vol. 201, pages 35 - 55 | - J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1997), vol. 201, pages 35 - 55 | - KREBBER ET AL., J. MIMUNOL. METHODS, (1997), vol. 201, pages 35 - 55 | - RIDGWAY ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1996), vol. 9, pages 617 - 621 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1984), vol. 81, page 1075 | - EMBO. J., (1987), vol. 6, page 2939 | - LEYTUS ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1986), vol. 25, page 5098 | - MARIETTE ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1993), vol. 36, pages 1315 - 1324 | - MARK ET AL., J MOL BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - DEMAISON ET AL., IMMUNOGENETICS, (1995), vol. 42, pages 342 - 352 | - PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1996), vol. 9, pages 617 - 621 | - KIPPS ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1991), vol. 87, pages 2087 - 2096 | - WELSCHOF ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHOD., (1995), vol. 179, pages 203 - 214 |