EP2848209 - Surgical device with a trigger lockout mechanism device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reed, Scott 23 Griswold Lane Winsted, Connecticut 06098 / US | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2017/12] |
Former [2015/12] | Soames, Candida Jane Maschio & Soames IP Limited 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 14184907.5 | 16.09.2014 | [2015/12] | Priority number, date | US201361878924P | 17.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361878924 P | US201414310266 | 20.06.2014 Original published format: US201414310266 | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2848209 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2848209 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/128, A61B17/068 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00367 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2903 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2923 (EP,US);
A61B2090/08021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] |
Former [2015/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Chirurgische Vorrichtung mit einer Abzugsperrmechanismusvorrichtung | [2015/12] | English: | Surgical device with a trigger lockout mechanism device | [2015/12] | French: | Dispositif chirurgical avec un dispositif à mécanisme de déclenchement de verrouillage | [2015/12] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 10.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2014 | AL | 22.03.2017 | AT | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | CZ | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | ES | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | HR | 22.03.2017 | IT | 22.03.2017 | LT | 22.03.2017 | LV | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | MK | 22.03.2017 | NL | 22.03.2017 | PL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | RS | 22.03.2017 | SE | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | SM | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | NO | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | LU | 16.09.2017 | MT | 16.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 16.09.2014 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
TR | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
MT | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 16.09.2014 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
MT | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 16.09.2014 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
MT | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.09.2014 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
MT | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
MT | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5830221 (STEIN JEFFREY A [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 6, line 18 - column 6, line 20; figures 8, 13,16,20 * * rotational drive; column 5, line 54 - column 5, line 57; figure 19 * [A] 3-15; | [A]WO2012064692 (ETHICON INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* lockout system with indicator;; figures 13A, 13B, 14A-14C *; | [A]EP2484294 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0165]; figures 7, 36A * |