EP2859814 - Handle with reinforced grip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lacoplast.IT SRL Via Bradolini, 26 31020 San Fior (TV) / IT | [2015/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gasparini, Bruno c/o Lacoplast.IT SRL Via Bradolini, 26 I-31020 San Fior (TV) / IT | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | Pistolesi, Roberto, et al Dragotti & Associati S.r.l. Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/16] | Belloni, Giancarlo, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 14188233.2 | 09.10.2014 | [2015/16] | Priority number, date | IT2013TV00161 | 11.10.2013 Original published format: IT TV20130161 | [2015/16] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2859814 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47B95/02, E05B1/00, F24C15/02, F25D23/02 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
A47B95/02 (EP);
E05B1/0015 (EP);
F24C15/024 (EP);
F25D23/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2015/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Türgriff mit verstärktem Handgriff | [2015/16] | English: | Handle with reinforced grip | [2015/16] | French: | Poignée renforcée | [2015/16] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2009104863 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,9 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0042] * * figures 3, 4 * [A] 8 [I] 4-7; | [IA]US2355978 (KEELER ISAAC S) [I] 1-5,7 * page 1, column l, line 48 - page 2, column l, line 8 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 6,8,9; | [A]WO2013098285 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5675867 | US3766598 | US8108972 | US5832564 | US2012227218 |