EP3009841 - Detection of IgM Antibodies using an immune complex (IC) ELISA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bernhard-Nocht-Institut für Tropenmedizin Bernhard-Nocht-Strasse 74 20359 Hamburg / DE | [2016/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Emmerich-Paloh, Petra Lokstedter Weg 94 20251 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Schmitz, Herbert Parchimer Str. 55 22143 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Deschermeier, Christina Wieddüp 27a 22459 Hamburg / DE | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Moré, Solveig Helga df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2016/16] | Application number, filing date | 14188831.3 | 14.10.2014 | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3009841 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/566, G01N33/68 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/566 (EP);
G01N33/6854 (EP);
G01N2333/70535 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nachweis von IgM-Antikörpern mit einem verbesserten Immunkomplex- (IC) ELISA | [2016/16] | English: | Detection of IgM Antibodies using an immune complex (IC) ELISA | [2016/16] | French: | Détection des anticorps à l'aide d'un complexe immunitaire amélioré ELISA | [2016/16] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 28.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP2492689 (BERNHARD NOCHT INST FUER TROPENMEDIZIN [DE]) [YD] 1-14 * claims 1-15, the reminder of the document; *; | [X]WO2013136193 (UNIV HEALTH NETWORK [CA], et al) [X] 15 * claim 45 and e.g. sequence 8 *; | [X]WO9925832 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [X] 15 * claim 19, feature 2a * | [XY] - ZHOUJIE DING ET AL, "Complement-Activating IgM Enhances the Humoral but Not the T Cell Immune Response in Mice", PLOS ONE, (20131108), vol. 8, no. 11, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0081299, page e81299, XP055169331 [X] 15 * abstract, page 3, left-hand column,, paragraph 2, right-hand column, last paragraph through page 4, left hand column, paragraph 2; right-hand column, paragraph 3,, feature 2 and 3; page 10, left-hand column, paragraph 1; * [Y] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0081299 | [XDY] - KUBAGAWA H; OKA S; KUBAGAWA Y; TORII I; TAKAYAMA E; KANG DW ET AL., "Identity of the elusive IgM Fc receptor (FcmuR) in humans", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (20091123), vol. 206, no. 12, pages 2779 - 93, XP002735944 [XD] 15 * abstract, page 2786, left and right-hand column, figure 7, page 2791,, left-hand column, last paragraph through right-hand column, 1st paragraph; * [Y] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20091107 | [XY] - H. SHIMA ET AL, "Identification of TOSO/FAIM3 as an Fc receptor for IgM", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY, (20091230), vol. 22, no. 3, doi:10.1093/intimm/dxp121, ISSN 0953-8178, pages 149 - 156, XP055169408 [X] 15 * abstract, figure 1, page 152, left-hand column; * [Y] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/intimm/dxp121 | by applicant | EP2492689 | - BALMASEDA A.; GUZMAN, M.G. ET AL., "Diagnosis of Dengue Virus Infection by Detection of Specific Immunoglobulin M (IgM) and IgA Antibodies in Serum and Saliva", CLIN VACCINE IMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 10, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1128/CDLI.10.2.317-322.2003, pages 317 - 322, XP008100531 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CDLI.10.2.317-322.2003 | - BERROW ET AL., "A versatile ligation-independent cloning method suitable for high-throughput expression screening applications", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (200703), vol. 35, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/gkm047, page E45, XP055004202 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkm047 | - DUERMEYER W; WIELAARD F. ET AL., "A new principle for the detection of specific IgM antibodies applied to an ELISA for hepatitis A", J MED VIROL, (1979), vol. 4, pages 25 - 32 | - EMMERICH ET AL., "Detection of Serotype-Specific Antibodies to the Four Dengue Viruses Using an Immune Complex Binding (ICB) ELISA.", PLOS NEGL TROP DIS., (201312), vol. 7, no. 12, page E2580 | - HITOSHI Y; LORENS J; KITADA SI; FISHER J; LABARGE M; RING HZ ET AL., "Toso, a cell surface, specific regulator of Fas-induced apoptosis in T cells", IMMUNITY, (199804), vol. 8, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/S1074-7613(00)80551-8, pages 461 - 71, XP002100823 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-7613(00)80551-8 | - HOOVER RG; DIECKGRAEFE BK; LYNCH RG, "T cells with Fc receptors for IgA: induction of T alpha cells in vivo and in vitro by purified IgA", J IMMUNOL., (198110), vol. 127, no. 4, pages 1560 - 3 | - KUBAGAWA H; OKA S; KUBAGAWA Y; TORII I; TAKAYAMA E; KANG DW ET AL., "Identity of the elusive IgM Fc receptor (FcmuR) in humans", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (20091123), vol. 206, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.20091107, pages 2779 - 93, XP002735944 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20091107 | - KUBAGAWA H; OKA S; KUBAGAWA Y; TORII I; TAKAYAMA E; KANG DW ET AL., "The long elusive IgM Fc receptor, FcmuR", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (201407), vol. 34, no. 1, pages S35 - 45 | - MARUOKA T; NAGATA T; KASAHARA M, "Identification of the rat IgA Fc receptor encoded in the leukocyte receptor complex", IMMUNOGENETICS, (200401), vol. 55, no. 10, pages 712 - 6 | - MORETTA L; WEBB SR; GROSSI CE; LYDYARD PM; COOPER MD, "Functional analysis of two human T-cell subpopulations: help and suppression of B-cell responses by T cells bearing receptors for IgM or IgG", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (19770701), vol. 146, no. 1, pages 184 - 200 | - OHNO T; KUBAGAWA H; SANDERS SK; COOPER MD, "Biochemical nature of an Fc mu receptor on human B-lineage cells", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (19901001), vol. 172, no. 4, pages 1165 - 75 | - OLSCHLAGER S; GABRIEL M; SCHMIDT-CHANASIT J; MEYER M; OSBORN E ET AL., "Complete sequence and phylogenetic characterisation of Crimean-Congohemorrhagic fever virus from Afghanistan", J CLIN VIROL, (2011), vol. 50, pages 90 - 92, XP027588105 | - ONG, L.Y.; T. PANG ET AL., "A simple adherence test for detection of IgM antibodies in typhoid", J MEDICAL MICROBIOL, (1989), vol. 29, no. 3, pages 195 - 198 | - SHIBUYA A; SAKAMOTO N; SHIMIZU Y; SHIBUYA K; OSAWA M; HIROYAMA T ET AL., "Fc alpha/mu receptor mediates endocytosis of IgM-coated microbes", NAT IMMUNOL., (200011), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 441 - 6 | - VAN DER BOOG PJ; VAN ZANDBERGEN G; DE FIJTER JW; KLAR-MOHAMAD N; VAN SEGGELEN A; BRANDTZAEG P ET AL., "Fc alpha RI/CD89 circulates in human serum covalently linked to IgA in a polymeric state", J IMMUNOL., (20020201), vol. 168, no. 3, pages 1252 - 8 | - VASQUEZ, HAFNER ET AL., "Evaluation of immunoglobulin M and G capture enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay Panbio kits for diagnostic dengue infections", J CLIN VIROL., (2007), vol. 39, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jcv.2007.04.003, pages 194 - 8, XP022118547 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcv.2007.04.003 | - "Laboratory diagnosis of dengue virus infections", VORNDAM, V.; G. KUNO, Dengue and dengue hemorrhagic fever, CAB INTERNATIONAL, (1997), pages 313 - 333 |