EP2852268 - Container-type data center cluster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/13] | Container-type data center | ||
[2016/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. B1-3A Intellectual Property Department Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhao, Jun Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department B1-3A, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen / CN | 02 /
Zhuang, Zhenyu Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department B1-3A, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen / CN | 03 /
Hu, Hangkong Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department B1-3A, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen / CN | 04 /
Hao, Mingliang Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department B1-3A, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen / CN | 05 /
Peng, Yonghui Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department B1-3A, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen / CN | 06 /
Zhang, Wei Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department B1-3A, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen / CN | 07 /
Wei, Na Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department B1-3A, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen / CN | 08 /
Xu, Shihui Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department B1-3A, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen / CN | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstrasse 8 80992 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/13] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Messerschmittstrasse 4 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14193131.1 | 07.12.2010 | [2015/13] | Priority number, date | CN20101042876 | 20.01.2010 Original published format: CN201010042876 | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2852268 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2852268 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H05K7/14 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
H05K7/2059 (EP,US);
H05K7/1497 (EP,US);
H05K7/20745 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] |
Former [2015/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Containerartiges Datenzentrencluster | [2016/20] | English: | Container-type data center cluster | [2016/20] | French: | Cluster de centres de données de type conteneur | [2016/20] |
Former [2015/13] | Containerartiges Datenzentrum | ||
Former [2015/13] | Container-type data center | ||
Former [2015/13] | Centre de données de type conteneur | Examination procedure | 25.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 28.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10193934.6 / EP2348803 | EP13188209.4 / EP2685800 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2010 | AL | 12.10.2016 | AT | 12.10.2016 | BE | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | HR | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | MK | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | RS | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | SM | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | IE | 07.12.2016 | LU | 07.12.2016 | MT | 07.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | NO | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 07.12.2010 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
TR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 07.12.2016 | ||
MT | 07.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 07.12.2010 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 07.12.2016 | ||
MT | 07.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 07.12.2010 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 07.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 07.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2007082351 (DATATAINER PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,5,11,12 * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 16 * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 11 * * page 12, line 15 - page 13, line 20 * * page 15, line 11 - page 16, line 29 * * page 18, lines 8-15; figures 1,4,5A * [Y] 3,7,9,13,14; | [X]US2009241578 (CARLSON ANDREW B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10-12 * paragraphs [0037] - [0041] - [0071] , [0085] - [0092]; figures 1-3,5-7 *; | [X]EP2101017 (ADVANCED SHIELDING TECHNOLOGIE [ES]) [X] 1,6,11 * paragraphs [0085] - [0092]; figures 11-15 *; | [Y]WO2007054578 (UNIFLAIR S P A [IT], et al) [Y] 3,7,9,13,14 * page 11, line 25 - page 13, line 5; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US2007135032 (WANG DAVID G [US]) [A] 2,12 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2008285232 (CLAASSEN ALAN [US], et al) [A] 2,12 * paragraphs [0042] - [0047]; figure 4 * |