EP2902759 - Sensor device, manufacturing method for a sensor device and method for determining an item of information relating to a temperature and/or relating to radiation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.10.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Utermoehlen, Fabian Vogelsangstrasse 145b 70197 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/32] | Application number, filing date | 14195330.7 | 28.11.2014 | [2015/32] | Priority number, date | DE201410201620 | 30.01.2014 Original published format: DE102014201620 | [2015/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2902759 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/04, G01J5/20 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
G01J5/20 (EP);
G01J5/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2015/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sensorvorrichtung, Herstellungsverfahren für eine Sensorvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Ermitteln einer Information bezüglich einer Temperatur und/oder bezüglich einer Strahlung | [2015/32] | English: | Sensor device, manufacturing method for a sensor device and method for determining an item of information relating to a temperature and/or relating to radiation | [2015/32] | French: | Dispositif de capteur, procédé de fabrication pour un dispositif de capteur et procédé de détermination d'une information concernant une température et/ou un rayonnement | [2015/32] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 04.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/11] | 02.11.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2009321641 (PARK KUN SIK [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,10-13 * paragraphs [0003] , [0019] , [0020] , [0044] - [0048] - [0081] - [0084] * * figures 2,8A,8B * [Y] 6-8 [I] 4-7,14,15; | [XI]JP2007225398 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,8-10 * paragraphs [0036] - [0040] * * figure 3 * [I] 4; | [XI]EP2573530 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2,10 * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] * * figure 4 * [I] 4; | [Y]US2012091342 (BERGER ISRAEL [IL], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0049] * * figure 8 * | [Y] - CRESSLER J, "Re-engineering silicon: Si-Ge heterojunction bipolar technology", IEEE SPECTRUM, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, vol. 32, no. 3, doi:10.1109/6.367973, ISSN 0018-9235, (19950501), pages 49 - 55, (20020806), XP007923146 [Y] 6,7 * page 49, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 55, column l, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/6.367973 | by applicant | DE102006028435 |