EP2884547 - Method for manufacturing a photodetector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2015/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartmann, Jean-Michel 34. Cité Le Pruney 38420 Le Versoud / FR | 02 /
Bogumilowicz, Yann 24 bis rue Mallifaud 38100 Grenoble / FR | 03 /
Fedeli, Jean-Marc 2 boulevard de Jomardière 38120 Saint-Egrève / FR | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | Talbot, Alexandre, et al Cabinet Hecké 28 Cours Jean Jaurès 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | Talbot, Alexandre, et al Cabinet Hecké Europole 10, rue d'Arménie - BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14197696.9 | 12.12.2014 | [2015/25] | Priority number, date | FR20130002934 | 13.12.2013 Original published format: FR 1302934 | [2015/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2884547 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2884547 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/105, H01L31/18, G02B6/42, G02B6/12 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
H01L31/1804 (EP,US);
G02B6/12004 (EP,US);
H01L31/105 (EP,US);
Y02E10/547 (US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/25] | H01L31/105, G02B6/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] |
Former [2015/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Fotodetektors | [2015/25] | English: | Method for manufacturing a photodetector | [2015/25] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un photo-détecteur. | [2015/25] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 23.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2014 | AL | 09.11.2016 | AT | 09.11.2016 | CY | 09.11.2016 | CZ | 09.11.2016 | DK | 09.11.2016 | EE | 09.11.2016 | ES | 09.11.2016 | FI | 09.11.2016 | HR | 09.11.2016 | IT | 09.11.2016 | LT | 09.11.2016 | LV | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | MK | 09.11.2016 | MT | 09.11.2016 | NL | 09.11.2016 | PL | 09.11.2016 | RO | 09.11.2016 | RS | 09.11.2016 | SE | 09.11.2016 | SI | 09.11.2016 | SK | 09.11.2016 | SM | 09.11.2016 | TR | 09.11.2016 | IE | 12.12.2016 | LU | 12.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | BG | 09.02.2017 | NO | 09.02.2017 | GR | 10.02.2017 | IS | 09.03.2017 | PT | 09.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 12.12.2014 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
TR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.12.2016 | ||
LU | 12.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 12.12.2014 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.12.2016 | ||
LU | 12.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 12.12.2014 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.12.2016 | ||
LU | 12.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.12.2016 | ||
LU | 12.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 09.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007104441 (AHN DONGHWAN [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 30 - page 5, paragraph 39 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2011012221 (FUJIKATA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 12, paragraph 195 - page 16, paragraph 254 * * figures 7,8 *; | [A]US2012126286 (NA YUN-CHUNG N [US], et al) [A] 1-7* figure 1 *; | [AD] - REN S ET AL, "Thin Dielectric Spacer for the Monolithic Integration of Bulk Germanium or Germanium Quantum Wells With Silicon-on-Insulator Waveguides", IEEE PHOTONICS JOURNAL, IEEE, USA, (201108), vol. 3, no. 4, doi:10.1109/JPHOT.2011.2162644, ISSN 1943-0655, pages 739 - 747, XP011485120 [AD] 1-7 * page 741, paragraph 3 * * page 744, paragraphs 3,4 * * figures 1e,1f,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPHOT.2011.2162644 | by applicant | - DE REN ET AL., "Thin Dielectric Spacer for the Monolithic Integration of Bulk Germanium or Germanium Quantum Wells With Silicon-on-Insulator Waveguides", IEEE PHOTONICS JOURNAL, (2011), vol. 3, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1109/JPHOT.2011.2162644, page 739, XP011485120 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPHOT.2011.2162644 |