EP3037783 - Information processing apparatus, particularly navigation system, and method of processing information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpine Electronics, Inc. 1-1-8 Nishi-Gotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barota, Ovidiu Petru c/o Alpine Electronics R&D Europe GmbH 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2019/39] |
Former [2016/26] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14199920.1 | 23.12.2014 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3037783 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3037783 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/36, G06F3/01, G06F3/048 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
G01C21/3664 (EP);
G06F3/0338 (EP);
G06F3/0362 (EP);
G06F3/0482 (EP);
G06F3/04892 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung, insbesondere Navigationssystem, Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Informationsverarbeitung | [2016/26] | English: | Information processing apparatus, particularly navigation system, and method of processing information | [2016/26] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'informations, en particulier système de navigation et procédé de traitement d'informations | [2016/26] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2014 | AL | 25.09.2019 | AT | 25.09.2019 | CY | 25.09.2019 | CZ | 25.09.2019 | DK | 25.09.2019 | EE | 25.09.2019 | ES | 25.09.2019 | FI | 25.09.2019 | HR | 25.09.2019 | IT | 25.09.2019 | LT | 25.09.2019 | LV | 25.09.2019 | MC | 25.09.2019 | MK | 25.09.2019 | MT | 25.09.2019 | NL | 25.09.2019 | PL | 25.09.2019 | RO | 25.09.2019 | RS | 25.09.2019 | SE | 25.09.2019 | SI | 25.09.2019 | SK | 25.09.2019 | SM | 25.09.2019 | TR | 25.09.2019 | IE | 23.12.2019 | LU | 23.12.2019 | BG | 25.12.2019 | NO | 25.12.2019 | GR | 26.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | IS | 26.01.2020 | PT | 27.01.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.12.2014 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
MT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
TR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 23.12.2014 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
MT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 23.12.2014 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 25.09.2019 | |
NO | 25.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2518442 (CLARION CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,9-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 5] , [0 12] , [0 18] , [0 25] - [0027] - [0 32] - [0036] * * figure 5 * [I] 5-8,12; | [A]US2005107949 (YOKOTA TATSUO [US]) [A] 5 * paragraphs [0055] , [0 56] , [0 67] *; | [A]EP2251644 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [A] 6-8,12 * paragraphs [0038] , [0 66] , [0 72] * * figures 1, 5 * | Examination | WO2007148128 | EP2000894 | US2013339891 | by applicant | US2008167812 | WO2007132578 | US2007290039 | JP2007263626 |