EP2896724 - Tin-plated copper-alloy terminal material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 3-2, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Yuki c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corporation Central Research Institute 1002-14 Mukohyama Naka-shi, Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Naoki c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corporation Corporate Marketing & Overseas Business Development Dept. Corporate Strategy Div. 3-2 Otemachi 1-Chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | 03 /
NAKAYA, Kiyotaka c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corporation Central Research Institute 1002-14 Mukohyama Naka-shi, Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 14200007.4 | 23.12.2014 | [2015/30] | Priority number, date | JP20130271703 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013271703 | JP20140210658 | 15.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014210658 | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2896724 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2896724 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/12, C25D7/00, H01R13/03, C25D3/14, C25D5/50, H01B1/02, C23C28/02, // C25D3/12, C25D3/30, C25D3/38 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
C25D5/611 (EP,US);
H01R13/03 (EP,CN,US);
C23C28/021 (US);
C25D3/14 (EP,US);
C25D5/12 (EP,US);
C25D5/505 (EP,US);
H01B1/02 (US);
H01B1/026 (US);
C25D3/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | C25D5/12, C25D7/00, H01R13/03, // C25D5/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] |
Former [2015/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verzinntes Klemmenmaterial aus Kupferlegierung | [2015/30] | English: | Tin-plated copper-alloy terminal material | [2015/30] | French: | Matériau de borne en alliage de cuivre étamé | [2015/30] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 23.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2014 | AL | 13.07.2016 | AT | 13.07.2016 | BE | 13.07.2016 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | ES | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | HR | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | MK | 13.07.2016 | NL | 13.07.2016 | PL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | RS | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | SM | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | NO | 13.10.2016 | GR | 14.10.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | IE | 23.12.2016 | LU | 23.12.2016 | MT | 23.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 23.12.2014 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
TR | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
IE | 23.12.2016 | ||
LU | 23.12.2016 | ||
MT | 23.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 23.12.2014 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
IE | 23.12.2016 | ||
LU | 23.12.2016 | ||
MT | 23.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 23.12.2014 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
IE | 23.12.2016 | ||
LU | 23.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
IE | 23.12.2016 | ||
LU | 23.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2874239 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [AP]EP2682263 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [AP] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 6,8 *; | [AP]EP2784184 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [AP] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] - [0052]; table 1 * * claims 1-16 *; | [A]EP2369688 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0077] - [0082] - [0086]; examples 101-116 *; | [A]JP2007258156 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1,3,4 * * tables 1-4 *; | [A]EP2351875 (MITSUBISHI SHINDO KK [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1,7 *; | [A]EP1788585 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] - [0053] , [0067] , [0070] , [0075] , [0080] *; | [A]JP2009057630 (MITSUBISHI SHINDO KK) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0030]; figures 1,2 * * tables 1-4 * | by applicant | JPH11102739 | JP2007177329 | JP2004225070 |