EP3010231 - Method for color mapping a video signal based on color mapping data and method of encoding a video signal and color mapping data and corresponding devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andrivon, Pierre c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 02 /
Lasserre, Sébastien c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 03 /
Bordes, Philippe c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Huchet, Anne Technicolor 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-Les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 14306650.4 | 17.10.2014 | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3010231 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/46, G09G5/02, H04N1/60, H04N9/67, H04N19/117, H04N19/136, H04N19/186, H04N19/85 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
H04N19/46 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N9/67 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G09G5/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G09G5/04 (EP);
H04N1/6058 (EP,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/136 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/44 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Farbumsetzung eines Videosignals auf Basis von Farbumsetzungsdaten und Verfahren zum Codieren eines Videosignals und Farbumsetzungsdaten und entsprechende Vorrichtungen | [2016/16] | English: | Method for color mapping a video signal based on color mapping data and method of encoding a video signal and color mapping data and corresponding devices | [2016/16] | French: | Procédé de mappage couleur d'un signal vidéo sur la base des données de mappage de couleur, procédé de codage d'un signal vidéo et de données de mappage de couleurs et dispositifs correspondants | [2016/16] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 28.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5349452 (MAEDA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-3,5,9-12,14,18,23,24 * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 21 * * figures 1,3 *; | [I]US6094454 (MITCHELL JOAN LAVERNE [US], et al) [I] 1,10 * figure 2 * * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 16 *; | [XI]US2005128499 (GLICKMAN JEFF [US]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0027] * * figure 3a * * paragraph [0020] * [I] 3-5,9,12-14,18,23-25; | [I]EP1784024 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [I] 1,10,23-25 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 2,3 *; | [XDI] - JILL BOYCE ET AL, "Draft Text of High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC), Including Format Range (RExt), Scalability (SHVC), and Multi-View (MV-HEVC) Extensions", JCT-VC MEETING; 30-6-2014 - 9-7-2014; SAPPORO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ), (20141001), vol. JCTVC-R1013_v6, XP055179226 [XD] 1-22 * Sections D.3.15, D.3.27, D.3.32 and E.2* [I] 23-28 | [A] - FOGG (HARMONIC) C ET AL, "Indication of SMPTE 2084, 2085 and carriage of 2086 metadata in HEVC", 16. JCT-VC MEETING; 9-1-2014 - 17-1-2014; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140114), no. JCTVC-P0084-v2, XP030115562 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * | [A] - ANDRIVON P ET AL, "SEI message for Colour Mapping Information", 16. JCT-VC MEETING; 9-1-2014 - 17-1-2014; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140113), no. JCTVC-P0126-v3, XP030115631 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * | [A] - SEGALL A ET AL, "Tone Mapping SEI Message", 20. JVT MEETING; 77. MPEG MEETING; 15-07-2006 - 21-07-2006;KLAGENFURT, AT; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-TSG.16 ),, (20060719), no. JVT-T060, ISSN 0000-0408, XP030006547 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * |