EP3037094 - Ophthalmic pharmaceutical composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2017 | Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poifa Warszawa SA ul. Karolkowa 22/24 01-207 Warszawa / PL | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grajewska-Wozniak, Bogna Polfa Warszawa SA ul. Karolkowa 22/24 01-207 Warszawa / PL | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Chmurzynski, Sedzimir Lech Zaklady Farmaceutyczne Polpharma S.A. Ul. Pelplinska 19 83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL | [2016/26] | Application number, filing date | 14460134.1 | 23.12.2014 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3037094 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/335, A61P27/14 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
A61K31/335 (EP,EA);
A61K9/08 (EA);
A61P27/02 (EP,EA);
A61P27/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ophthalmische pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung | [2016/26] | English: | Ophthalmic pharmaceutical composition | [2016/26] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique ophtalmique | [2016/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [ ] | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [ ] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2006097458 (ALTANA PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,8,13,14 * example 1 * * claims 1-21 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]WO2012012264 (ALCON RES LTD [US], et al) [X] 1,3,8,11-14 * example 1 * * claims 1-4 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]US2007297990 (SHAH MANDAR V [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-9,14 * claims 1,8,9,12,14 * * page 11, paragraph 0075 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]EP2189157 (KYOWA HAKKO KIRIN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,11,13,14 * examples 1-13 * * claims 1-9 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]JP2014105157 (ROHTO PHARMA) [X] 1,2,8,9,11 * claims 1,2,4,6 * [Y] 1-15 | by applicant | WO0154687 | US2005209312 | WO2008036847 |