|
28.09.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.09.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.09.2022 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2022 |
Request for revocation of patent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2022 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2022 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2022 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.08.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
14 |
|
03.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2022 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2022 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2022 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
50 |
|
06.05.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2022 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
27.04.2022 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
22.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2022 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2022 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2022 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.12.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Appeal |
90 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Appeal |
37 |
|
09.11.2021 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2021 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
31.07.2019 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.07.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2019 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.02.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2019 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
106 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.11.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.01.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
20.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
21 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
30 |