EP2948242 - AN AMMONIA OXIDATION CATALYST FOR THE PRODUCTION OF NITRIC ACID BASED ON METAL DOPED YTTRIUM ORTHO COBALTATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YARA International ASA Drammensveien 131 P.O. Box 343 Skøyen 0213 Oslo / NO | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLER, David Hovet Ring 53 3931 Porsgrunn / NO | 02 /
GRØNVOLD, Marianne Søbye Fogtgate 30 3936 Porsgrunn / NO | 03 /
SAHLI, Nibal Plassane 18B 3743 Skien / NO | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2015/49] | Application number, filing date | 14701218.1 | 24.01.2014 | [2015/49] | WO2014EP51427 | Priority number, date | NO20130000145 | 28.01.2013 Original published format: NO 20130145 | [2015/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014114764 | Date: | 31.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2948242 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2948242 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/00, C01B21/26 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
B01J23/002 (EP,US);
C01B21/38 (US);
B01J23/83 (RU,US);
B01J23/8892 (US);
C01B21/265 (EP,RU,US);
B01J2523/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMMONIAKOXIDATIONSKATALYSATOR ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SALPETERSÄURE AUF DER BASIS VON METALLDOTIERTEM YTTRIUM-ORTHOKOBALTAT | [2015/49] | English: | AN AMMONIA OXIDATION CATALYST FOR THE PRODUCTION OF NITRIC ACID BASED ON METAL DOPED YTTRIUM ORTHO COBALTATE | [2015/49] | French: | CATALYSEUR D'OXYDATION DE L'AMMONIAC DESTINÉ À LA PRODUCTION D'ACIDE NITRIQUE BASÉ SUR UN ORTHO-COBALTATE D'YTTRIUM DOPÉ EN MÉTAL | [2015/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 17.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2014 | AL | 29.08.2018 | AT | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | FI | 29.08.2018 | HR | 29.08.2018 | IT | 29.08.2018 | LT | 29.08.2018 | LV | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | MK | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | RS | 29.08.2018 | SE | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SM | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | NO | 29.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | IS | 29.12.2018 | GB | 24.01.2019 | IE | 24.01.2019 | LU | 24.01.2019 | MT | 24.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.01.2014 | |
AL | 29.08.2018 | ||
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
IE | 24.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
MT | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
IE | 24.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
MT | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
IE | 24.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
MT | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
IE | 24.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
IE | 24.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 29.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2006010904 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2009054728 (YARA INT ASA [NO], et al) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [I]EP2202201 (SUED CHEMIE CATALYSTS ITALIA [IT]) [I] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [XD] - GINA PECCHI ET AL, "Catalytic performance in methane combustion of rare-earth perovskites RECoMnO(RE: La, Er, Y)", CATALYSIS TODAY, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 172, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.CATTOD.2011.02.032, ISSN 0920-5861, (20110214), pages 111 - 117, (20110304), XP028275045 [XD] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cattod.2011.02.032 | by applicant | EP0532024 | RU2185237 | - PECCHI, G ET AL., "Catalytic performance in methane combustion of rare-earth perovskites RECoo,soMno,so03 (RE: La, Er,, Y", CATALYSIS TODAY, (2011), vol. 172, pages 111 - 117 |