|
15.04.2024 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.04.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2024 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2024 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2024 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.02.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.01.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2024 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
46 |
|
18.10.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.10.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2023 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.10.2023 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.10.2023 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.10.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.08.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.08.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2023 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.07.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.07.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2023 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2023 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2023 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.11.2022 |
Description |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2022 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2022 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.09.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.09.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
43 |
|
13.07.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2022 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2022 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2022 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2022 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2022 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2022 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.05.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.05.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
04.02.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.02.2022 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
28 |
|
02.02.2022 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2022 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2021 |
Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.05.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
81 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.08.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
16.05.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.02.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
44 |
|
14.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2019 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
14.02.2019 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
01.02.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
40 |
|
27.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
08.08.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
27 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
39 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2018 |
Description |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 017 |
Opposition |
34 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 018 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 019 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
22.02.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2017 |
Summons (notice) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
36 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings (Legal Division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings (Legal Division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
27 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 015 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 016 |
Opposition |
20 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
35 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
20 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
19 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
15 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.03.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.03.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
18.03.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
13.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
27 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |