EP2959312 - MULTIPULSE ELASTOGRAPHY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Echosens 30 Place d'Italie 75013 Paris / FR | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDRIN, Laurent 17 Rue Isabeau F-92240 L'Hay Les Roses / FR | 02 /
BASTARD, Cécile 14 Rue Claude Decaen F-75012 Paris / FR | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25 rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [2017/50] |
Former [2016/01] | Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25, Rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 14705516.4 | 19.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014EP53264 | Priority number, date | FR20130051405 | 19.02.2013 Original published format: FR 1351405 | [2016/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014128182 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2959312 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2959312 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52, A61B8/08 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
A61B8/485 (EP,CN,RU,US);
G01S7/52046 (EP,CN,US);
A61B8/5207 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61B8/5223 (US);
G01S7/52042 (EP,CN,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIPULS-ELASTOGRAFIEVERFAHREN | [2016/01] | English: | MULTIPULSE ELASTOGRAPHY METHOD | [2016/01] | French: | PROCEDE D'ELASTOGRAPHIE MULTI-IMPULSIONNELLE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 04.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2014 | AL | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | MK | 13.12.2017 | MT | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | RS | 13.12.2017 | SE | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | SM | 13.12.2017 | IE | 19.02.2018 | LU | 19.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | BG | 13.03.2018 | NO | 13.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MK | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
NO | 13.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2010069751 (HAZARD CHRISTOPHER ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [ 0022] - [0033] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0072] * [I] 3,4,6,10-13; | [A]US2010256530 (VARGHESE TOMY [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011007278 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-14* page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 29 *; | [XI]EP2294983 (MR HOLDINGS HK LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,5,7,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0011] - [0020] - [0025] - [0049] * [I] 3,4,6,13; | [X]WO2011064688 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,13,14 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 6, line 2 * * page 10, line 19 - page 20, line 27 *; | [X]WO2011132014 (SUPER SONIC IMAGINE [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,13,14 * abstract * * page 6, line 20 - page 13, line 17 * * page 14, line 29 - page 15, line 12 *; | [A]US2012158323 (HAZARD CHRISTOPHER ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2843290 | US2010069751 | WO2011064688 |