EP2959003 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING METHANE USING METHANOGENIC MICROORGANISMS AND APPLYING SPECIFIC NITROGEN CONCENTRATIONS IN THE LIQUID PHASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krajete GmbH Scharitzerstrasse 30 4020 Linz / AT | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAJETE, Alexander Scharitzerstrasse 30 A-4020 Linz / AT | 02 /
HERWIG, Christoph Jenbachgasse 73-2 A-1130 Vienna / AT | 03 /
RITTMANN, Simon Rubin-Bittmann-Promenade 5/1/8 A-1030 Vienna / AT | 04 /
SEIFERT, Arne Fasangasse 51/2/10 A-1030 Vienna / AT | 05 /
BERNACCHI, Sebastien Huglgasse 26/2/18 A-1150 Vienna / AT | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14706562.7 | 24.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014EP53545 | Priority number, date | GB20130003156 | 22.02.2013 Original published format: GB 201303156 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014128300 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2959003 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12P5/02, C12M1/107, C12M1/00, C12M1/34 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
C12M21/04 (EP);
C12M23/58 (EP);
C12M41/32 (EP);
C12M41/34 (EP);
C12P5/023 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP);
Y02P20/133 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METHAN MITTELS METHANPRODUZIERENDER MIKROORGANISMEN UND ZUR AUFTRAGUNG SPEZIFISCHER STICKSTOFFKONZENTRATIONEN IN DER FLÜSSIGPHASE | [2016/01] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING METHANE USING METHANOGENIC MICROORGANISMS AND APPLYING SPECIFIC NITROGEN CONCENTRATIONS IN THE LIQUID PHASE | [2016/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION DE MÉTHANE À L'AIDE DE MICRO-ORGANISMES MÉTHANOGÈNES ET APPLICATION DE CONCENTRATIONS PRÉCISES D'AZOTE EN PHASE LIQUIDE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 18.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2009130734 (METS LAURENS [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,13,14,20,28 * page 1, paragraphs [0007]-[0008] * * page 2, paragraphs [0029]-[0030] * * page 3, paragraph [0036] * * page 3, paragraph [0043] - page 4, paragraph [0046]; figures 1-3 * * examples 12-15 * [Y] 3,6,7,10-12,15-18,21-27; | [Y]WO2012110256 (KRAJETE ALEXANDER [AT], et al) [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 19 * * page 20, line 26 - page 21, line 10 * * page 28, lines 9-21 * * page 31, line 13 - page 41, line 5 * * page 41, lines 7-23 * * page 45, lines 1-5 * * page 46, line 26 - page 52, line 28 * * page 54, lines 14-16 *; | [Y]WO2012110257 (KRAJETE ALEXANDER [AT]) [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * page 30, line 28 - page 31, line 13 * * page 36, line 1 - page 37, line 1 * * page 37, line 10 - page 38, line 3 * * page 47, line 19 - page 48, line 7 * * page 54, lines 24-26 * * page 57, line 11 - page 58, line 24 * * page 62, lines 17-21; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0745562 (MATSUMURA MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 21-27 * column 4, lines 1-8 * * column 8, lines 34-39 * * column 11, lines 43-59; figure 16 *; | [XP]WO2014009026 (KRAJETE GMBH [AT]) [XP] 1-20,28 * the whole document * | [Y] - JINDRICH PROCHAZKA ET AL, "Stability and inhibition of anaerobic processes caused by insufficiency or excess of ammonia nitrogen", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20111016), vol. 93, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S00253-011-3625-4, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 439 - 447, XP019997906 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-011-3625-4 |