EP3003892 - BAGS AND METHOD FOR MAKING SUCH BAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/15] | BAG, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A BAG AND MACHINE SYSTEM FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A BAG | ||
[2019/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windmöller & Hölscher KG Münsterstrasse 50 49525 Lengerich/Westf. / DE | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIES, Jörg Christian Am Telgenkamp 12 49201 Dissen / DE | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2020/16] |
Former [2016/15] | Vogel, Andreas, et al Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 14707363.9 | 26.02.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014EP53758 | Priority number, date | DE201310105381 | 24.05.2013 Original published format: DE102013105381 | [2016/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014187582 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3003892 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3003892 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/10 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
B65D33/105 (EP,US);
B65D33/06 (US);
B31B50/86 (EP,US);
B65D33/004 (US);
B65D33/007 (US);
B65D33/04 (US);
B31B2150/00 (EP,US);
B31B2150/001 (EP,US);
B31B2150/003 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | B65D33/10, B31B1/86 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEUTEL SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BEUTELS | [2019/48] | English: | BAGS AND METHOD FOR MAKING SUCH BAGS | [2019/48] | French: | SAC D'EMBALLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE TELS SACS D'EMBALLAGE | [2019/48] |
Former [2016/15] | BEUTEL, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BEUTELS SOWIE MASCHINENSYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BEUTELS | ||
Former [2016/15] | BAG, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A BAG AND MACHINE SYSTEM FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A BAG | ||
Former [2016/15] | SACHET, PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À FABRIQUER UN SACHET, ET SYSTÈME DE MACHINE SERVANT À FABRIQUER UN SACHET | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 01.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2014 | AL | 15.04.2020 | CY | 15.04.2020 | CZ | 15.04.2020 | DK | 15.04.2020 | EE | 15.04.2020 | ES | 15.04.2020 | FI | 15.04.2020 | HR | 15.04.2020 | LT | 15.04.2020 | LV | 15.04.2020 | MC | 15.04.2020 | MK | 15.04.2020 | MT | 15.04.2020 | NL | 15.04.2020 | PL | 15.04.2020 | RO | 15.04.2020 | RS | 15.04.2020 | SE | 15.04.2020 | SI | 15.04.2020 | SK | 15.04.2020 | SM | 15.04.2020 | BG | 15.07.2020 | NO | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.07.2020 | IS | 15.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 26.02.2014 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
MK | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 26.02.2014 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 26.02.2014 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 15.04.2020 | |
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 15.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2985355 (READ ROBERT E) [X] 1,32 * column 4, line 60 - column 10, line 74; figures 1-15; claims 1,2,5,6 * [I] 2-31; | [A]FR1370903 (WINDMOLLER & HOLSCHER FA) [A] 1,17-32* figures 2,8,15a,15b,16,17 *; | [A]DE4238655 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]) [A] 1,17-32 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 33 *; | [A]DE9403188U (BISCHOF & KLEIN [DE]) [A] 1-16,32 * page 7, line 7 - page 10, paragraph 2; figures 1-5 *; | [AD]EP0781710 (FISCHER & KRECKE GMBH & CO [DE]) [AD] 1-16,32 * abstract * |