EP2953468 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A STREPTOMYCES-BASED BIOLOGICAL CONTROL AGENT AND AN INSECTICIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience LP 2 T.W. Alexander Drive Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSCH, Wolfram Alfred-Nobel-Str. 50 40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
CURTIS, Damian 1540 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95618 / US | 03 /
GUAN, Shaohua 801 S Hwy 377 Pilot Point, TX 76258 / US | 04 /
GUILHABERT-GOYA, Magalie 1540 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95618 / US | 05 /
ROYALTY, Reed, Nathan 15410 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95618 / US | 06 /
SPRINGER, Bernd Alfred-Nobel-Str. 50 40789 Monheim / DE | 07 /
THIELERT, Wolfgang Alfred-Nobel-Str. 50 40789 Monheim / DE | 08 /
ZHU, Hong 1540 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95618 / US | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 14707537.8 | 10.02.2014 | [2015/51] | WO2014US15602 | Priority number, date | US201361763130P | 11.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361763130 P | US201361767156P | 20.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361767156 P | [2015/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014124379 | Date: | 14.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2953468 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/54, A01P7/04, A01N43/22, A01N43/56, A01N43/653, A01N47/02, A01N47/24, A01N47/40, A01N51/00, A01N53/00, A01N63/02 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
A01N63/28 (EP,US);
A01N37/22 (US);
A01N43/12 (US);
A01N43/16 (US);
A01N43/40 (US);
A01N43/50 (US);
A01N43/54 (US);
A01N43/56 (US);
A01N43/78 (US);
A01N47/14 (US);
A01N47/22 (US);
A01N53/00 (US);
| C-Set: |
A01N63/28, A01N41/10, A01N43/12, A01N43/22, A01N43/56, A01N43/56, A01N43/653, A01N43/713, A01N47/02, A01N47/22, A01N47/24, A01N47/40, A01N51/00, A01N53/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINEM STREPTOMYCES-BASIERTEN BIOLOGISCHEN BEKÄMPFUNGSMITTEL UND EINEM INSEKTIZID | [2015/51] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A STREPTOMYCES-BASED BIOLOGICAL CONTROL AGENT AND AN INSECTICIDE | [2015/51] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT UN AGENT DE CONTRÔLE BIOLOGIQUE À BASE DE STREPTOMYCES ET UN INSECTICIDE | [2015/51] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 26.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/43] | 06.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS4625026B ; | [AD]US3849398 (KITANO N, et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2009037242 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (1971), vol. 1971, no. 28, Database accession no. 1971-47413S, XP002723612 & JPS4625026B B 19710000 (NIPPON TOKUSHU NOYAKU SEIZO KK) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3849398 | GB1507193 | JPS53109998 | US4245432 | US4272417 | US4808430 | WO8910396 | EP0539588 | WO9633270 | WO9844140 | US5876739 | WO0026345 | WO0026356 | WO0131042 | WO0141558 | WO0151654 | US2001029014 | WO0228186 | WO0234946 | WO0236831 | WO0244407 | US2002102582 | US2002120964 | WO02080675 | US6468747 | WO02096882 | WO02100163 | WO03013224 | US2003097687 | WO03052073 | US2003126634 | US2003176428 | US2003188347 | WO03106457 | WO2004011601 | WO2004039986 | WO2004053062 | WO2004072235 | US2004172669 | WO2004074492 | WO2004099160 | WO2004099447 | US2004250317 | US2005039226 | WO2005035486 | US2005086719 | WO2005054479 | WO2005054480 | WO2005059103 | WO2005061720 | WO2005063094 | WO2005077934 | US2005188434 | WO2005085216 | US2005216969 | WO2005103266 | WO2005103301 | US2006059581 | US2006059590 | US2006070139 | WO2006043635 | US2006095986 | WO2006056433 | US2006130175 | US2006162007 | WO2006089633 | WO2006098952 | WO2006100288 | US2006230473 | WO2006108674 | WO2006108675 | WO2006128569 | WO2006128570 | WO2006128573 | WO2006128571 | WO2006128572 | WO2006130436 | WO2006128568 | US2006282915 | US2007028322 | WO2007017186 | WO2007024782 | WO2007027777 | US2007067868 | WO2007040280 | WO2007057407 | US2007143876 | WO2007075459 | WO2007091277 | WO2007101369 | WO2007115644 | WO2007115643 | WO2007115646 | WO2007140256 | WO2007142840 | US2007292854 | WO2007149134 | WO2008002872 | WO2008009360 | US2008028482 | US2008064032 | US2008070260 | WO2008054747 | WO2008066153 | WO2008067911 | US2008167456 | US2008196127 | WO2008104503 | WO2008112019 | WO2008114282 | WO2008122406 | US2008260932 | US2008289060 | US2008312082 | WO2008151780 | US2008320616 | WO2009037242 | WO2009049851 | US2009130071 | WO2009064652 | US2009137395 | US2009210970 | WO2009103049 | WO2009102873 | US2009217423 | WO2009110018 | WO2009111263 | US2009265817 | US2009300784 | WO2010005692 | WO2010006713 | JP2010018586 | US2010024077 | US2010050282 | WO2010024976 | US2010077501 | US2010080887 | WO2010037016 | WO2010069502 | WO2010074747 | WO2010074751 | WO2010077816 | WO2010080829 | US2010184079 | WO2010108973 | WO2010117737 | WO2010117735 | WO2011022469 | US2011067141 | WO2011034704 | WO2011049233 | CN102057925 | WO2011062904 | WO2011063411 | WO2011066384 | WO2011066360 | US2011138504 | WO2011075593 | WO2011075595 | WO2011084632 | WO2011084621 | WO2011153186 | WO2012033794 | WO2012051199 | WO2012075426 | WO2013003558 | WO2013010094 | WO2013012775 | - STONESIFER; BALTZ, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (198502), vol. 82, pages 1180 - 1183 | - DELIC ET AL., MUTATION RESEARCH/FUNDAMENTAL AND MOLECULAR MECHANISMS OF MUTAGENESIS, (197002), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 167 - 182 | - CHEN, J ANTIBIOT (TOKYO, (200111), vol. 54, no. 11, pages 967 - 972 | - KIESER, T. ET AL., Practical Streptomyces Genetics., JOHN INNES CENTRE, (2000), pages 99 - 107 | - TORU IKEUCHI ET AL., J. ANTIBIOTICS, (197209), vol. 25, page 548 | - DU ET AL., APPL MICROBIOL BIOTECHNOL, (2013), vol. 97, no. 14 | - NIU ET AL., CHEM CIOL, (2013), vol. 20, no. 1 | - TOSHIKO KANZAKI ET AL., JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, SER. A, (196106), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 93 - 97 | - TORU IKEUCHI ET AL., JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, (197209), pages 548 - 550 | - BAUR ET AL., PESTICIDE SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 51, pages 131 - 152 | - R. WEGLER, Chemie der Pflanzenschutz- und Schadlingsbekampfungsmittel, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1970), vol. 2, pages 401 - 412 | - COLBY, SR., "Calculating Synergistic and antagonistic Responses of Herbicide Combinations", WEEDS, (1967), vol. 15, pages 20 - 22, XP001112961 |