EP2966992 - HIGH TEMPERATURE GERMINATING LETTUCE SEEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rijk Zwaan Zaadteelt en Zaadhandel B.V. Burgemeester Crezeelaan 40 2678 KX De Lier / NL | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOUDENBERG, Leendert Jacobus Jean Monnetring 76 3137 DC Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
COPPOOLSE, Eric Roland Burg. Breebaartlaan 9 3171 CC Poortugaal / NL | 03 /
LENSSEN, Gerardus Maria Scheepmakersingel 56 2645 LC Delfgauw / NL | 04 /
SCHUT, Johannes Wilhelmus Markiezenstraat 48 4724 BC Wouw / NL | 05 /
SMITS, Egbert Carolus Johannes De Meekrap 7 4761 XV Steenbergen / NL | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14712250.1 | 17.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014EP55338 | Priority number, date | EP20130159494 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: EP 13159494 | US201313836277 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313836277 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014140378 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2966992 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2966992 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01H5/10, A01H5/12 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C12N15/01 (EP,US);
A01H3/00 (US);
A01H5/12 (EP,US);
A01H6/1472 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEI HOHER TEMPERATUR KEIMENDE BLATTSALATSAMEN | [2016/03] | English: | HIGH TEMPERATURE GERMINATING LETTUCE SEEDS | [2016/03] | French: | GRAINES DE LAITUE À GERMINATION À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE | [2017/51] |
Former [2016/03] | GRAINES DE LAITUE GERMANT À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 12.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2017 | 21.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18154467.7 / EP3335547 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.2019
ADMISSIBLE "Keine Patente auf Saatgut!" e.V. Frohschammerstr. 14 80807 München / DE | [2019/15] | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 26.07.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.12.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.02.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.03.2024 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2014 | AL | 06.06.2018 | AT | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | PL | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | RS | 06.06.2018 | SE | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | SM | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | NO | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | PT | 08.10.2018 | GB | 17.03.2019 | IE | 17.03.2019 | LU | 17.03.2019 | MT | 17.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 17.03.2014 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
GB | 17.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
MT | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
GB | 17.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
MT | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
GB | 17.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 06.06.2018 | |
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A] - JASON ARGYRIS ET AL, "A gene encoding an abscisic acid biosynthetic enzyme (LsNCED4) collocates with the high temperature germination locusin lettuce (sp.)", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS ; INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PLANT BREEDING RESEARCH, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20100812), vol. 122, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S00122-010-1425-3, ISSN 1432-2242, pages 95 - 108, XP019869617 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-010-1425-3 | [A] - J. ARGYRIS ET AL, "Genetic Variation for Lettuce Seed Thermoinhibition Is Associated with Temperature-Sensitive Expression of Abscisic Acid, Gibberellin, and Ethylene Biosynthesis, Metabolism, and Response Genes", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (20080808), vol. 148, no. 2, doi:10.1104/pp.108.125807, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 926 - 947, XP055070719 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.108.125807 | [A] - ANDRES R SCHWEMBER ET AL, "A genetic locus and gene expression patterns associated with the priming effect on lettuce seed germination at elevated temperatures", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (20100103), vol. 73, no. 1-2, ISSN 1573-5028, pages 105 - 118, XP019794086 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - TINGTING DONG ET AL, "Nitrate, abscisic acid and gibberellin interactions on the thermoinhibition of lettuce seed germination", PLANT GROWTH REGULATION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20111204), vol. 66, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S10725-011-9643-5, ISSN 1573-5087, pages 191 - 202, XP035013195 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10725-011-9643-5 | Opposition | - ARGYRIS J. et al., "A gene encoding an abscisic acid biosynthetic enzyme (LsNCED4) collocates with the high temperature germination locusin lettuce (sp.)", Theor Appl Genet, (20110000), vol. 122, pages 95 - 108, XP019869617 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-010-1425-3 | - ARGYRIS J. et al., "Genetic Variation for Lettuce Seed Thermoinhibition Is Associated with Temperature-Sensitive Expression of Abscisic Acid, Gibberellin, and Ethylene Biosynthesis, Metabolism, and Response Genes", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (20080000), vol. 148, no. 2, pages 926 - 947, XP055070719 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.108.125807 | - CHANDLER C.H. et al., "Does your gene need a background check? How genetic background impacts the analysis of mutations, genes, and evolution", Trends in Genetics, (20130000), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 358 - 364, XP055574263 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tig.2013.01.009 | - SCHWEMBER A. R. et al., "A genetic locus and gene expression patterns associated with the priming effect on lettuce seed germination at elevated teniperatures", Plant Mol Biol ., (20100000), vol. 73, pages 105 - 118, XP019794086 | - YOONG F.-Y. et al., "Genetic Variation for Thermotolerance in Lettuce Seed Germination Is Associated with Temperature-Sensitive Regulation of ETHYLENE RESPONSE FACTOR1 (ERF1)", Plant Physiology, (20160000), vol. 170, pages 472 - 488, XP055574269 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.15.01251 |