EP3011460 - DEVICE, HOST APPARATUS, HOST SYSTEM, AND MEMORY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2016/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIMOTO, Akihisa c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
SAKAMOTO, Hiroyuki c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
MATSUKAWA, Shinichi c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2016/17] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/17] | Application number, filing date | 14713935.6 | 06.02.2014 | [2016/17] | WO2014JP53391 | Priority number, date | JP20130129832 | 20.06.2013 Original published format: JP 2013129832 | JP20140019731 | 04.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014019731 | [2016/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014203558 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3011460 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/16, G06F13/42 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
G06F13/16 (EP,US);
G06F3/0622 (US);
G06F13/4234 (EP,US);
G06F3/0637 (US);
G06F3/0679 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, HOSTVORRICHTUNG, HOSTSYSTEM UND SPEICHERSYSTEM | [2016/17] | English: | DEVICE, HOST APPARATUS, HOST SYSTEM, AND MEMORY SYSTEM | [2016/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE MÉMOIRE | [2016/17] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 09.08.2016 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 13.09.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 14.02.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5440631 (AKIYAMA RYOTA [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 17 ** abstract *; | [X]US2003233565 (KIM SUNG-HYUN [KR]) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0026] * * abstract *; | [A]US2012159044 (BAE JI HYAE [KR]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * abstract * |