EP2948063 - ULTRASOUND PROBE AND ULTRASOUND IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAN, Caifeng c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
GELISSEN, Jozef Hubertus c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
MÄUELER, Sebastian c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | Steffen, Thomas Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 14715993.3 | 14.01.2014 | [2015/49] | WO2014IB58248 | Priority number, date | US201361755090P | 22.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361755090 P | [2015/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014115056 | Date: | 31.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2948063 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
A61B8/5223 (EP,US);
A61B8/0858 (EP,US);
A61B8/4254 (EP,US);
A61B8/4461 (EP,US);
A61B8/4472 (US);
G10K11/355 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (EP);
A61B5/4872 (EP,US);
A61B8/085 (EP,US);
A61B8/429 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLSONDE UND ULTRASCHALLBILDGEBUNGSSYSTEM | [2015/49] | English: | ULTRASOUND PROBE AND ULTRASOUND IMAGING SYSTEM | [2015/49] | French: | SONDE ULTRASONORE ET SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE ULTRASONORE | [2015/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 26.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2011201937 (FUJII KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0030] , [0031] , [0039] , [0063] , [0064] , [0072] , [0078] , [0094] - [0096]; figures 1,4,8,18 * [Y] 4,6-10,12-15 [I] 5; | [XI]US2008097214 (MEYERS PAUL F [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0038] , [0061] , [0064] , [0065]; figures 1,2,15 * [I] 11; | [XI]US2010125207 (KIM SEONG RAE [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0022] , [0027]; figures 1,2,3 * [I] 11; | [XI]US2011112405 (BARTHE PETER G [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0074] , [0092]; figures 1,6,7 * [I] 11; | [X]US2009030326 (KIM JUNG-HOE [KR], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0008] , [0028] - [0031] - [0037] , [0042] - [0047]; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]WO2013005776 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [Y] 4,6,7 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2009254779 (NIDEK KK) [Y] 8 * abstract *; | [YA]US2012316407 (ANTHONY BRIAN W [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * paragraphs [0022] , [0032] , [0033] , [0039] , [0071] , [0085] , [0094] , [0095] , [0127]; figures 1,11 * [A] 4-7; | [A]US2012083692 (STOLL JEFFREY [US]) [A] 4,6-9 * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] , [0048] , [0049] , [0052] , [0053] , [0060]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]KR101075878B (HIRONIC CO LTD [KR]) [A] 4,6-9 * figure 2 *; | [A]JP2010082053 (CROSSWELL KK) [A] 11-15 * abstract * | [Y] - MASAHIKO KODA ET AL, "Sonographic subcutaneous and visceral fat indices represent the distribution of body fat volume", ABDOMINAL IMAGING, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20060901), vol. 32, no. 3, ISSN 1432-0509, pages 387 - 392, XP019539067 [Y] 12-15 * page 388, column right, paragraph 2; figure 2 * * page 391, column right, paragraph 2 * * abstract * | by applicant | - BELLESARI ET AL., "Sonographic measurement of adipose tissue", JOURNAL OF DIAGNOSTIC MEDICAL SONOGRAPHY, (199301), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 11 - 18 | - TORNAGHI ET AL., "Anthropometric or ultrasonic measurements in assessment of visceral fat? A comparative study", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF OBESITY, (1994), pages 771 - 775 | - S. H. CONTRERAS ORTIZ, "Ultrasound image enhancement: A review", BIOMEDICAL SIGNAL PROCESSING AND CONTROL, (2012), vol. 7, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bspc.2012.02.002, pages 419 - 428, XP028404777 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bspc.2012.02.002 | - A. K. JAIN ET AL., "Object Matching Using Deformable Templates", IEEE TRANS. PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (1996), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 267 - 278 | - ARMELLINI, F ET AL., "Measured and predicted total and visceral adipose tissue in women. Correlations with metabolic parameters", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF OBESITY, (1994), vol. 18, pages 641 - 647, XP008170123 |