|
13.10.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
07.10.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2022 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.07.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.07.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2022 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2022 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.06.2022 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
15 |
|
24.05.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2022 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2021 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.02.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.02.2021 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.02.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2020 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
14.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
15 |
|
08.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.02.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
03.02.2020 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.10.2019 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
26.09.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2019 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.09.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Request for correction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.02.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
52 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
56 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2017 |
Communication regarding the forthcoming grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.05.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
20.01.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2016 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
10.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
30 |
|
19.06.2015 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.06.2015 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.06.2015 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.03.2015 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.03.2015 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
19.03.2015 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.03.2015 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
18 |
|
19.03.2015 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
18 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
18 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |