EP3013355 - IL-2 FOR USE IN TREATING ALZHEIMER DISEASE AND RELATED DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/18] | BOOSTING TREG CELLS FOR TREATING ALZHEIMER DISEASE AND RELATED DISORDERS | ||
[2018/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICM - Institut du Cerveau et de la Moelle Epinière Hôpital Pitié Salpêtrière 47/83, Boulevard de l'Hôpital 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states APHP (Assistance Publique - Hôpitaux de Paris) 3 Avenue Victoria 75001 Paris / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states INSERM - Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101 rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cedex 13 / FR | For all designated states SORBONNE UNIVERSITE 21 rue de l'École de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | [2019/32] |
Former [2019/18] | For all designated states ICM - Institut du Cerveau et da la Moelle Epinière Hôpital Pitié Salpêtrière 47/83, Boulevard de l'Hôpital 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states APHP (Assistance Publique - Hôpitaux de Paris) 3 Avenue Victoria 75001 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75116 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states INSERM - Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101 rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cedex 13 / FR | |||
For all designated states SORBONNE UNIVERSITE 21 rue de l'École de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2019/11] | For all designated states ICM - Institut du Cerveau et da la Moelle Epinière Hôpital Pitié Salpêtrière 47/83, Boulevard de l'Hôpital 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states APHP (Assistance Publique - Hôpitaux de Paris) 3 Avenue Victoria 75001 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75116 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states INSERM - Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101 rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cedex 13 / FR | |||
For all designated states Université Pierre et Marie Curie - Paris 6 (UPMC) 4 place Jussieu 75005 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2016/18] | For all designated states ICM - Institut du Cerveau et da la Moelle Epinière Hôpital Pitié Salpêtrière 47/83, Boulevard de l'Hôpital 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states APHP (Assistance Publique - Hôpitaux de Paris) 3 Avenue Victoria 75001 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states INSERM - Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101 rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cedex 13 / FR | |||
For all designated states Université Pierre et Marie Curie - Paris 6 (UPMC) 4 place Jussieu 75005 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOROTHÉE, Guillaume 141 rue Gambetta F-94120 Fontenay-sous-Bois / FR | 02 /
PIAGGIO, Eliane 77 rue de la Mare F-75020 Paris / FR | 03 /
AIT AHMED, Dylla 14 rue du Pressoir F-75020 Paris / FR | 04 /
AUCOUTURIER, Pierre 75 avenue du Colonel Fabien F-93100 Montreuil / FR | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2019/32] |
Former [2016/18] | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 14733140.9 | 20.06.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014EP63080 | Priority number, date | EP20130173617 | 25.06.2013 Original published format: EP 13173617 | US201361838984P | 25.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361838984 P | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014206899 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3013355 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3013355 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/20, A61P25/28 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
A61K38/2013 (EP,US);
A61K38/20 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61K2039/545 (US);
C07K14/55 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IL-2 ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON ALZHEIMER-KRANKHEIT UND VERWANDTEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2018/09] | English: | IL-2 FOR USE IN TREATING ALZHEIMER DISEASE AND RELATED DISORDERS | [2018/13] | French: | IL-2 POUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER ET DE TROUBLES ASSOCIES | [2018/09] |
Former [2016/18] | VERSTÄRKUNG VON TREG-ZELLEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS ALZHEIMER UND VERWANDTEN ERKRANKUNGEN | ||
Former [2016/18] | BOOSTING TREG CELLS FOR TREATING ALZHEIMER DISEASE AND RELATED DISORDERS | ||
Former [2016/18] | STIMULATION DE CELLULES TREG POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER ET DE TROUBLES APPARENTÉS | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 11.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 09.11.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 09.11.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.11.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2014 | AL | 07.08.2019 | AT | 07.08.2019 | CY | 07.08.2019 | CZ | 07.08.2019 | EE | 07.08.2019 | ES | 07.08.2019 | HR | 07.08.2019 | IT | 07.08.2019 | LT | 07.08.2019 | LV | 07.08.2019 | MC | 07.08.2019 | MK | 07.08.2019 | MT | 07.08.2019 | NL | 07.08.2019 | PL | 07.08.2019 | RO | 07.08.2019 | RS | 07.08.2019 | SI | 07.08.2019 | SK | 07.08.2019 | SM | 07.08.2019 | TR | 07.08.2019 | BG | 07.11.2019 | GR | 08.11.2019 | PT | 09.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.06.2014 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
MT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 07.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2005260767 (CLERICI MARIO [IT], et al) [X] 1,3,10-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0037] , [0048] , [0049] * * claims 14,16,17,20 * [Y] 1-14; | [XYI]WO2012123381 (ASSIST PUBL HOPITAUX DE PARIS [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11,13,14 * abstract * * page 2, lines 19,20 * * page 3 * * page 4, lines 3,4 * * page 5, line 21 * * page 17, lines 15-17 * * page 25 - page 26 * * claims 1,29,30,36 * [Y] 1-14 [I] 4; | [A] - ROSENKRANZ ET AL, "Higher frequency of regulatory T cells in the elderly and increased suppressive activity in neurodegeneration", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, NL, (20070727), vol. 188, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.JNEUROIM.2007.05.011, ISSN 0165-5728, pages 117 - 127, XP022206091 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jneuroim.2007.05.011 |