EP3010335 - ILLUMINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/11] |
Former [2018/50] | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2016/17] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VREHEN, Joris Jan c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
GIELEN, Vincent Stefan David c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
CALON, Georges Marie c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
PASVEER, Willem Franke c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
JANSEN, Martijn Evert Paul c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
BOONEKAMP, Erik Paul c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 07 /
VANDEN WYNGAERT, Hilbrand c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/33] |
Former [2016/17] | 01 /
VREHEN, Joris Jan c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
GIELEN, Vincent Stefan David c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
CALON, Georges Marie c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
04 /
PASVEER, Willem Franke c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
05 /
JANSEN, Martijn Evert Paul c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
06 /
BOONEKAMP, Erik Paul c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
07 /
VANDEN WYNGAERT, Hilbrand c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Vanden Wyngaert, Hilbrand, et al Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2023/32] |
Former [2016/17] | Vanden Wyngaert, Hilbrand, et al Philips Lighting B.V. Philips Lighting Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 14734755.3 | 13.06.2014 | [2016/17] | WO2014EP62297 | Priority number, date | EP20130172221 | 17.06.2013 Original published format: EP 13172221 | EP20130181696 | 26.08.2013 Original published format: EP 13181696 | [2016/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014202465 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3010335 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3010335 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01K63/06 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
A01K63/06 (EP,US);
A01K61/80 (EP,US);
F21V23/003 (EP,US);
F21W2131/308 (US);
Y02A40/81 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/17] | A01K61/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2016/17] | English: | ILLUMINATION SYSTEM | [2016/17] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2016/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 02.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 03.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.03.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 10.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.01.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.08.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.08.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4036189 (NEFF GREGOR N) [X] 1-15 * column 5, line 24 - line 30 * * figures 1,3 *; | [AD]US5732655 (BABA KENJI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US6203170 (PATRICK PAUL H [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 6 * | Examination | WO2009066231 | WO2010016769 | WO2011019288 |