|
04.04.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.03.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2022 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.02.2022 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2022 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2021 |
F3011.2 Oral Proceedings: Summons VICO |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.12.2021 |
F3011.2 Oral Proceedings: Summons VICO |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.12.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2021 |
Request for acceleration of appeal proceedings |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.09.2021 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2021 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2021 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2021 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.05.2021 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2021 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.05.2021 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2021 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2021 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2021 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2021 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2021 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
16 |
|
23.07.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
16 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2020 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2020 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2020 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.07.2019 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.07.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
92 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
22.02.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2019 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2018 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Information about non-relevance of third-party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2018 |
Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.01.2018 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2017 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2017 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2017 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.11.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.11.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
22.11.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
18.08.2017 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2017 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
06.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.2015 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
28.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
28.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
22 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
10 |