EP2943592 - NONINVASIVE PRENATAL MOLECULAR KARYOTYPING FROM MATERNAL PLASMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | 06.10.2023 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Chinese University Of Hong Kong Office Of Research And Knowledge Transfer Services Room 301, Pi Ch'iu Building Shatin, New Territories / HK | [N/P] |
Former [2023/43] | For all designated states The Chinese University Of Hong Kong Office Of Research And Knowledge Transfer Services Room 301, Pi Ch'iu Building Shatin, New Territories Hong Kong / CN | ||
Former [2015/47] | For all designated states The Chinese University Of Hong Kong Shatin, N.T. Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIU, Wai Kwun Rossa House 31 Double Haven 52 Ma Lok Path Shatin New Territories Hong Kong SAR / CN | 02 /
LO, Yuk Ming Dennis 4th Floor 7 King Tak Street Homantin Kowloon Hong Kong SAR / CN | 03 /
CHAN, Kwan Chee Flat A 13/F Block 34 Broadway Street, Mei Foo Sun Chuen Kowloon Hong Kong SAR / CN | 04 /
JIANG, Peiyong Flat 7, 1/F Block B, Kwong Lam Court 62-66 Siu Lek Yuen Road Shatin New Territories Hong Kong SAR / CN | 05 /
YU, Cheuk Yin Jandy 20/F, Block5, Double Cove 8 Wu Kai Sha Road Ma On Shan New Territories Hong Kong SAR / CN | [2015/47] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/45] |
Former [2015/47] | Merryweather, Colin Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14737956.4 | 09.01.2014 | [2015/47] | WO2014AU00012 | Priority number, date | US201361751213P | 10.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361751213 P | US201313837776 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313837776 | [2015/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014107765 | Date: | 17.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2943592 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2943592 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 17.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G16B20/00, G16B20/10 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
G16B20/00 (EP,KR,US);
G16B20/10 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6827 (KR);
G16B30/10 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/35] | G06F19/18 | ||
Former IPC [2015/47] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTINVASIVE PRÄNATALE MOLEKULARE KARYOTYPISIERUNG AUS MATERNALEM PLASMA | [2015/47] | English: | NONINVASIVE PRENATAL MOLECULAR KARYOTYPING FROM MATERNAL PLASMA | [2015/47] | French: | CARYOTYPAGE MOLÉCULAIRE PRÉNATAL NON INVASIF À PARTIR DE PLASMA MATERNEL | [2015/47] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 10.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23200760.9 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2012071621 (UNIV HONG KONG CHINESE [CN], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * [0007], [0008], [0009], [0050], [0052], [0085], [0095], [0145], [0161], [0162], [0166] *; | [A]US2012237928 (RAVA RICHARD P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A] - LO Y M DENNIS ET AL, "Maternal plasma DNA sequencing reveals the genome-wide genetic and mutational profile of the fetus", SCIENCE TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, AAAS - AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, US, (20101208), vol. 2, no. 61, doi:10.1126/SCITRANSLMED.3001720, ISSN 1946-6242, pages 61ra91 - 1, XP008132703 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.3001720 | [A] - JOEP DE LIGT ET AL, "P1-47: Massively parallel sequencing for noninvasive prenatal diagnosis of partial feta aneuploidies", PRENATAL DIAGNOSIS; ISPD 16TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PRENATAL DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY, CHICHESTER, SUSSEX, GB; MIAMI, USA, vol. 32, no. Suppl. 1, doi:10.1111/J.1097-0223.2012.03905_X.X, ISSN 0197-3851, (20120601), page 59, (20120601), XP008179757 [A] 1-15 * page 59, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1097-0223.2012.03905_x.x | International search | [A]US2012237928 (RAVA RICHARD P [US], et al); | [A] - DE LIGT, J. ET AL., "Massively parallel sequencing for noninvasive prenatal diagnosis of partial feta aneuploidies", PRENATAL DIAGNOSIS., (2012), vol. 32, no. SUPP., page 59, XP008179757 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1097-0223.2012.03905_x.x | [XP] - YU, S.C.Y. ET AL., "Noninvasive prenatal molecular karyotyping from maternal plasma", PLOS ONE., (201304), vol. 8, no. ISSUE, page E60968, XP055160833 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0060968 | [XP] - SRINIVASAN, A. ET AL., "Noninvasive detection of fetal subchromosome abnormalities via deep sequencing of maternal plasma", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS., (20130207), vol. 92, pages 167 - 176, XP055125834 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajhg.2012.12.006 | [XP] - CHEN, S. ET AL., "A method for noninvasive detection of fetal large deletions/duplications by low coverage massively parallel sequencing''.", PRENATAL DIAGNOSIS., (2013), vol. 33, pages 584 - 590, XP055136781 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pd.4110 | Examination | - Anupama Srinivasan ET AL, "Noninvasive Detection of Fetal Subchromosome Abnormalities via Deep Sequencing of Maternal Plasma", The American Journal of Human Genetics, (20130201), vol. 92, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.ajhg.2012.12.006, ISSN 0002-9297, pages 167 - 176, XP055125834 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajhg.2012.12.006 | - Stephanie C. Y. Yu ET AL, "Noninvasive Prenatal Molecular Karyotyping from Maternal Plasma", PLoS ONE, (20130417), vol. 8, no. 4, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0060968, page e60968, XP055160833 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0060968 |