EP2943843 - METHOD, DEVICE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR MONITORING AN INDUSTRIAL CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Secure-Nok AS Professor Olav Hanssensvei 7A 4021 Stavanger / NO | [2015/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOUMB, Siv-Hilde 1306 Arthur Street Houston, Texas 77019 / US | [2015/47] | Representative(s) | Håmsø Patentbyrå AS P.O. Box 171 4301 Sandnes / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2015/47] | Håmsø Patentbyrå ANS Postboks 171 4302 Sandnes / NO | Application number, filing date | 14738256.8 | 07.01.2014 | [2015/47] | WO2014NO50001 | Priority number, date | US201361750169P | 08.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361750169 P | [2015/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014109645 | Date: | 17.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2943843 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 17.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/048, G06F21/00, H04L12/26, H04L29/02, G06F21/57, H04L12/24, G05B19/042, G05B19/406, G05B23/02, G06F21/55, G06Q10/06, G06Q50/26, H04L29/06 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
G06F21/552 (EP,US);
G05B19/0428 (US);
G05B19/406 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q50/26 (EP,US);
H04L41/0631 (EP,US);
H04L63/1425 (EP,US);
H04L63/1433 (EP,US);
G05B2219/14006 (US);
G05B2219/14076 (US);
G05B23/0229 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2153 (EP,US);
Y02P90/80 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/47] | G05B19/048, G06F21/00, H04L12/26, H04L29/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES INDUSTRIELLEN STEUERUNGSSYSTEMS | [2015/47] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR MONITORING AN INDUSTRIAL CONTROL SYSTEM | [2015/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE PERMETTANT DE CONTRÔLER UN SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE INDUSTRIEL | [2015/47] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: XN | 24.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 21.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2042961 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0044] *; | [A]US2011099375 (HAMMES PETER C [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] ** paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] *; | [X]US2012180133 (AL-HARBI SAAD A [SA], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0050] *; | [X]US2012224057 (GILL JASVIR SINGH [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0161] * * figures 1,2,4 * | International search | [A]US2004003286 (KALER CHRISTOPHER G [US], et al); | [A]WO2004111785 (VERANO INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2009128905 (SIEMENS ENERGY INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2011146284 (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SERVICES LTD [IE], et al); | [X]US2012224057 (GILL JASVIR SINGH [US], et al); | [AP]US2013081103 (UNER ERIC RIDVAN [US], et al); | [XP]EP2657880 (VERINT SYSTEMS LTD [IL]); | [AP]EP2660674 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [AP]US2013307682 (JERHOTOVA EVA [CZ], et al); | [A] - BRIESEMEISTER, L. ET AL., "Detection, correlation, and visualization of attacks against critical infrastructure systems", EIGHTH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PRIVACY SECURITY AND TRUST, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100817), pages 15 - 22, XP031769460 | by applicant | US2012224057 | - "Decision Support for Choice of Security Solution: The Aspect-Oriented Risk Driven Development (AORDD) Framework", SIV HILDE HOUMB, Doctoral Thesis, NORWEGIAN UNIVERSITY OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (200711), vol. 208, page 332 | - "Trust-Based Security Level Evaluation Using Bayesian Belief Networks", SIV HILDE HOUMB; INDRAKSHI RAY; INDRAJIT RAY; SUDIP CHAKRABORTY ET AL., Trans. on Comput. Sci. X, LNCS, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (2010), vol. 6340, pages 154 - 186 | - SIV HILDE HOUMB; SUDIP CHAKRABORTY; INDRAKSHI RAY; INDRAJIT RAY, "Using Trust-Based Information Aggregation for Predicting Security Level of Systems", DBSEC, (2010), pages 241 - 256 | - SIV HILDE HOUMB; VIRGINIA N. L. FRANQUEIRA; ERLEND AGOY ENGUM, "Quantifying security risk level from CVSS estimates of frequency and impact", JOURNAL OF SYSTEMS AND SOFTWARE, (2010), vol. 83, no. 9, pages 1622 - 1634 | - "Franqueira and Erlend Agoy Engum. Estimating Impact and Frequency of Risks to Safety and Mission Critical Systems Using CVSS", SIV HILDE HOUMB; VIRGINIA N.L., ISSRE 2008 Supplemental Proceedings: 1st Workshop on Dependable Software Engineering, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY PRESS, (20081111), page 6 | - RALPH LANGER, TO KILL A CENTRIFUGE, A TECHNICAL ANALYSIS OF WHAT STUXNET'S CREATORS TRIED TO ACHIEVE, URL: http://www.langner.com/en/wp-content/uploads/2013/11/To-kill-a-centrifuqe.pdf |