EP3008909 - METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND MEDIA FOR CONTROLLING AUDIO OF AN HDMI AUDIO SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2020/41] |
Former [2017/45] | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2016/16] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERTS, Eric, Jason 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Thorniley, Peter Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/41] |
Former [2016/16] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14740009.7 | 12.06.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014US42150 | Priority number, date | US201361834518P | 13.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361834518 P | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014201266 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3008909 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3008909 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/422, H04N21/4363, H04N21/485 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
H04N21/4222 (EP,US);
H03G3/20 (US);
H04N21/42204 (US);
H04N21/43635 (EP,US);
H04N21/4852 (EP,US);
H04N21/42208 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND MEDIEN ZUR STEUERUNG DER AUDIOAUSGABE EINES HDMI-AUDIOSYSTEMS | [2020/22] | English: | METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND MEDIA FOR CONTROLLING AUDIO OF AN HDMI AUDIO SYSTEM | [2016/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉS SYSTÈMES ET MOYENS PERMETTANT DE RÉGLER LE VOLUME AUDIO D'UN SYSTÈME AUDIO HDMI | [2020/23] |
Former [2016/16] | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND MEDIEN ZUR STEUERUNG DER AUDIOLEISTUNG EINES HDMI-AUDIOSYSTEMS | ||
Former [2016/16] | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET SUPPORTS DE COMMANDE AUDIO D'UN SYSTÈME AUDIO HDMI | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 22.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2014 | AL | 07.10.2020 | AT | 07.10.2020 | CY | 07.10.2020 | CZ | 07.10.2020 | DK | 07.10.2020 | EE | 07.10.2020 | ES | 07.10.2020 | FI | 07.10.2020 | HR | 07.10.2020 | IT | 07.10.2020 | LT | 07.10.2020 | LV | 07.10.2020 | MC | 07.10.2020 | NL | 07.10.2020 | PL | 07.10.2020 | RO | 07.10.2020 | RS | 07.10.2020 | SE | 07.10.2020 | SI | 07.10.2020 | SK | 07.10.2020 | SM | 07.10.2020 | BG | 07.01.2021 | NO | 07.01.2021 | GR | 08.01.2021 | IS | 07.02.2021 | PT | 08.02.2021 | IE | 12.06.2021 | LU | 12.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 12.06.2014 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 12.06.2021 | ||
LU | 12.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 12.06.2021 | ||
LU | 12.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 12.06.2021 | ||
LU | 12.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 12.06.2021 | ||
LU | 12.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
LU | 12.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 07.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010052843 (CANNISTRARO ALAN [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * figure 9 ** paragraphs [0084] - [0091] *; | [X]EP2485484 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * figures 4,11 * * paragraphs [0105] - [0108] * * paragraphs [0172] - [0185] * |