EP2948052 - DEEP TISSUE FLOWMETRY USING DIFFUSE SPECKLE CONTRAST ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pedra Technology Pte Ltd 11 Preston Road Singapore 109349 / SG | [2020/29] |
Former [2015/49] | For all designated states Nanyang Technological University 50 Nanyang Avenue Singapore 639798 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Kijoon 401-703 Biseul Village 333 Techno Jungang-daero Hyeonpung-myeon Dalseong-gun, Daegu 711-873 / KR | 02 /
BI, Renzhe West Coast Drive Block 508, 12-257 Singapore 120508 / SG | 03 /
DONG, Jing 131 Mount Vernon St Boston, MA, 02108 / US | [2016/41] |
Former [2015/49] | 01 /
LEE, Kijoon 50 Nanyang Avenue Singapore 639798 / SG | ||
02 /
BI, Renzhe 50 Nanyang Avenue Singapore 639798 / SG | |||
03 /
DONG, Jing 50 Nanyang Avenue Singapore 639798 / SG | Representative(s) | KIPA AB P O Box 1065 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [2015/49] | Application number, filing date | 14743829.5 | 15.01.2014 | [2015/49] | WO2014US11675 | Priority number, date | US201361755700P | 23.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361755700 P | US201361830256P | 03.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361830256 P | [2015/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014116483 | Date: | 31.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2948052 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2948052 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/026 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
A61B5/0261 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/7246 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TIEFENGEWEBE-FLUSSMESSUNG MIT DIFFUSER SPECKLE-KONTRAST-ANALYSE | [2015/49] | English: | DEEP TISSUE FLOWMETRY USING DIFFUSE SPECKLE CONTRAST ANALYSIS | [2015/49] | French: | DÉBITMÈTRIE DE TISSU PROFOND À L'AIDE D'ANALYSE DIFFUSE DE CONTRASTE DE GRANULARITÉ | [2015/49] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 11.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21178386.5 / EP3957238 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 27.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.09.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 27.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.09.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.08.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 23.08.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 11.07.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.07.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.07.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.07.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.01.2014 | AL | 09.06.2021 | AT | 09.06.2021 | CY | 09.06.2021 | CZ | 09.06.2021 | DK | 09.06.2021 | EE | 09.06.2021 | FI | 09.06.2021 | HR | 09.06.2021 | LT | 09.06.2021 | LV | 09.06.2021 | MC | 09.06.2021 | PL | 09.06.2021 | RO | 09.06.2021 | RS | 09.06.2021 | SI | 09.06.2021 | SK | 09.06.2021 | SM | 09.06.2021 | BG | 09.09.2021 | NO | 09.09.2021 | IS | 09.10.2021 | GB | 15.01.2022 | IE | 15.01.2022 | LU | 15.01.2022 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 15.01.2014 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
GB | 15.01.2022 | ||
IE | 15.01.2022 | ||
LU | 15.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
GB | 15.01.2022 | ||
IE | 15.01.2022 | ||
LU | 15.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
GB | 15.01.2022 | ||
LU | 15.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
LU | 15.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008287808 (TEARNEY GUILLERMO J [US], et al) [A] 1-4* paragraphs [0039] , [0044] *; | [A]US2012071769 (DUNN ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0028] , [0089] *; | [X] - HAIYING CHENG ET AL, "Temporal statistical analysis of laser speckle images and its application to retinal blood-flow imaging", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20080707), vol. 16, no. 14, doi:10.1364/OE.16.010214, page 10214, XP055296643 [X] 1-4 * section 2. "Framework of TS-LSI" * * section 3. "Validation of TS-LSI" * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.16.010214 | International search | [A]US2002180972 (ANSARI RAFAT RAZAK [US], et al); | [A]WO2007017661 (TARILIAN CONSULTING LTD [GB], et al); | [A]US2007179366 (PEWZNER ELIAHU [IL], et al); | [Y]US2012130215 (FINE ILYA [IL], et al); | [X]US2012184831 (SEETAMRAJU MADHAVI [US], et al) | Examination | - ZIMNYAKOV D A ET AL, "FULL-FIELD SPECKLE TECHNIQUES IN BLOOD MICROCIRCULATION MONITORING", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING; 20-1-2004 - 20-1-2004; SAN JOSE,, (20001003), vol. 4241, doi:10.1117/12.431548, ISBN 978-1-62841-730-2, pages 370 - 377, XP008004834 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.431548 | - XIYI CHEN ET AL, "Lateral laser speckle contrast analysis combined with line beam scanning illumination to improve the sampling depth of blood flow imaging", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, US, vol. 37, no. 18, doi:10.1364/OL.37.003774, ISSN 0146-9592, (20120915), pages 3774 - 3776, (20120906), XP001578494 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.37.003774 | - HAIYING CHENG ET AL, "Laser speckle imaging of blood flow in microcirculation; LSI of blood flow in microcirculation", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL GB, (20040407), vol. 49, no. 7, doi:10.1088/0031-9155/49/7/020, ISSN 0031-9155, pages 1347 - 1357, XP020024077 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/49/7/020 | by applicant | - HAIYING CHENG ET AL., "Temporal statistical analysis of laser speckle images and its application to retinal blood-flow imaging", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20080707), vol. 16, no. 14, doi:doi:10.1364/OE.16.010214, page 10214, XP055296643 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.16.010214 | - HAIYING CHENG et al., "Temporal statistical analysis of laser speckle images and its application to retinal blood-flow imaging", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20080707), vol. 16, no. 14, page 10214 |