EP3016830 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING FUNCTIONAL UNITS ARRANGED IN A DECENTRALIZED MANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility AG Hammerweg 1 8304 Wallisellen / CH | [2019/20] |
Former [2016/19] | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Freilagerstrasse 40 8047 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REICHLIN, Anton Lärchenstrasse 6 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Deffner, Rolf, et al Siemens Mobility GmbH Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/19] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14747307.8 | 25.06.2014 | [2016/19] | WO2014EP63358 | Priority number, date | EP20130174634 | 02.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13174634 | EP20130178451 | 30.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13178451 | [2016/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015000757 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3016830 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B61L27/00, B61L19/06 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
B61L27/70 (EP,US);
B61L27/04 (US);
B61L19/06 (EP,US);
B61L27/40 (US);
G05B15/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN VON DEZENTRAL ANGEORDNETEN FUNKTIONSEINHEITEN | [2016/19] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING FUNCTIONAL UNITS ARRANGED IN A DECENTRALIZED MANNER | [2016/19] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER DES UNITÉS FONCTIONNELLES DÉCENTRALISÉES | [2016/19] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 07.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2019 | 26.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/39] | 07.08.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/39] | Appeal following examination | 11.11.2019 | Appeal received No. T0431/20 | 28.01.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.07.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 28.07.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008025414 (SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 7, line 17 - line 33 * * page 9, line 17 - page 11, line 19 * * page 14, line 4 - line 17 * * figures 1A, 1B, 2 *; | [A]DE102010045462 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0017] ** figure 1 *; | [I]EP2549620 (SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [I] 1-16 * claims 1-3 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0037] * * figures 1,7 * | by applicant | EP2301202 | EP2302202 | WO2013013908 |