EP3035946 - PRODUCT COMPRISING A PLANT FOR MEDICINAL, COSMETIC, COLORING OR DERMATOLOGIC USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWM Luxembourg 17 rue Edmond Reuter 5326 Contern / LU | [2021/45] |
Former [2016/26] | For all designated states SWM Luxembourg s.a.r.l. 17 rue Edmond Reuter 5326 Contern / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAGOT, Philippe 14, Um Goldbierchen 5720 Aspelt / LU | 02 /
PONS, Esther 1 rue Charles Gounod F-33600 Pessac / FR | 03 /
MOMPON, Bernard 10 allee Diderot F-56000 Vannes / FR | 04 /
ROUSSEAU, Cédric 13 rue du Chanoine Lelievre F-72000 Le Mans / FR | [2016/46] |
Former [2016/26] | 01 /
RAGOT, Philippe 79 rue d'Isaac F-72000 Le Mans / FR | ||
02 /
PONS, Esther 1 rue Charles Gounod F-33600 Pessac / FR | |||
03 /
MOMPON, Bernard 10 allee Diderot F-56000 Vannes / FR | |||
04 /
ROUSSEAU, Cédric 13 rue du Chanoine Lelievre F-72000 Le Mans / FR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14752858.2 | 18.08.2014 | [2016/26] | WO2014EP67579 | Priority number, date | US201361867814P | 20.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361867814 P | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015024908 | Date: | 26.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3035946 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/00, A23F3/30, A61K8/00 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
A23F3/14 (EP,US);
A61K36/00 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K9/7007 (US);
A23F3/30 (EP,KR,US);
A23F3/34 (EP,US);
A23F3/385 (EP,US);
A23F5/36 (EP,US);
A23L2/395 (EP,KR,US);
A23L27/11 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/522 (EP,KR,US);
A61K36/28 (KR);
A61K36/82 (KR,US);
A61K8/02 (KR,US);
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A61K8/4953 (KR,US);
A61K8/97 (RU,US);
A61K8/9711 (EP,US);
A61K8/9717 (EP,US);
A61K8/9733 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP,RU);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2800/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Title | German: | PRODUKT MIT EINER PFLANZE ZUR MEDIZINISCHEN, KOSMETISCHEN, FÄRBENDEN ODER DERMATOLOGISCHEN VERWENDUNG | [2016/26] | English: | PRODUCT COMPRISING A PLANT FOR MEDICINAL, COSMETIC, COLORING OR DERMATOLOGIC USE | [2016/26] | French: | PRODUIT COMPRENANT UNE PLANTE POUR UN USAGE MÉDICINAL, COSMÉTIQUE, DE COLORATION OU DERMATOLOGIQUE | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 28.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.10.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 21.10.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.10.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO2014141201 (FALL SAFALL [FR], et al) [E] 1-4,9-28,41-52 * figure -; example -; claim - *; | [E]WO2014134254 (SCHWEITZER MAUDUIT INT INC [US]) [E] 1-56 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2013133685 (BIOTROPICS MALAYSIA BERHAD [MY], et al) [XP] 1-52 * claim - *; | [X]WO2012170761 (SCHWEITZER MAUDUIT INT INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9-28,41-52 * example -; claim 14 *; | [X]WO2012056141 (MOMPON BERNARD [FR]) [X] 1-56 * the whole document *; | [XD]WO9424892 (BROWN & WILLIAMSON TOBACCO [US]) [XD] 1-4,9-28,41-52 * example -; claim - *; | [XD]US3847164 (MATTINA C, et al) [XD] 1-4,9-28,41-52 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1222915 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-52 * paragraph [0017]; example -; claim - *; | [X]CN102919430 ; | [X]KR20100114348 ; | [X]JP2005119967 ; | [X]JPH10304822 ; | [X]CN103054156 ; | [X]CN1957777 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 53, Database accession no. 2013-H79728, XP002732079 & CN102919430 A 20130213 (YIXIAO FOOD QUZHOU CO LTD) [X] 1-52 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 02, Database accession no. 2010-N71423, XP002732080 & KR20100114348 A 20101025 (SEONG J L) [X] 1-52 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 39, Database accession no. 2005-375724, XP002732081 & JP2005119967 A 20050512 (KYOWA SANGYO KK) [X] 1-28,41-52 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 05, Database accession no. 1999-053264, XP002732082 & JPH10304822 A 19981117 (HARADA SEICHA KK) [X] 1-52 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 64, Database accession no. 2013-P63695, XP002732083 & CN103054156 A 20130424 (INNER MONGOLIA KUNMING CIGARETTE CO LTD) [X] 1-4,9-28,41-52 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 63, Database accession no. 2007-664910, XP002732084 & CN1957777 A 20070509 (XIAMEN CIGARETTE FACTORY) [X] 1-4,9-28,41-52 * abstract * | Examination | CN102919430 | KR20100114348 | JP2005119967 | JPH10304822 | CN103054156 | CN1957777 |