|
14.12.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
14.12.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.12.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2022 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.08.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.08.2022 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
02.08.2022 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2022 |
Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.08.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
10 |
|
20.08.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.06.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.03.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.03.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.03.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.03.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.03.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.03.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
27.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.07.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2014 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
33 |