EP2946072 - REMOVING RING DOWN EFFECTS FROM SONIC WAVEFORMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services Inc. 3000 N. Sam Houston Parkway E. Houston, Texas 77032 / US | [2019/25] |
Former [2015/48] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRACADAS, Philip, William 5811 Charlotte St. Houston, TX 77005 / US | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Michael John, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/48] | Jennings, Michael John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14760047.2 | 28.02.2014 | [2015/48] | WO2014US19696 | Priority number, date | US201361774700P | 08.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361774700 P | [2015/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014137844 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2946072 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/09, E21B47/095, E21B47/12, G01V1/48, E21B47/00 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
G01V1/48 (EP,US);
G01V1/30 (RU);
E21B47/005 (US);
E21B47/14 (RU);
G01V2210/32 (EP,US);
G01V2210/324 (EP,US);
G01V2210/3246 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/48] | E21B47/09, E21B47/095, E21B47/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] | Title | German: | ENTFERNUNG VON RING-DOWN-EFFEKTEN AUS AKUSTIKKURVEN | [2015/48] | English: | REMOVING RING DOWN EFFECTS FROM SONIC WAVEFORMS | [2015/48] | French: | ÉLIMINATION D'EFFETS D'ALTERNANCE À PARTIR DE FORMES D'ONDE SONIQUES | [2015/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 02.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010265796 (STEINSIEK ROGER R [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-3,6A-9C,11A-12,15A,B * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0036] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0045] - [0049] , [0050] *; | [XY]US4210967 (INGRAM JOHN D [US]) [X] 1,9,10,13-15 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 35 * * claims 1,2,5 * [Y] 2,12; | [Y]US2012069705 (ZHAO JINSONG [US]) [Y] 2,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] , [0065] * | International search | [X]US4210967 (INGRAM JOHN D [US]); | [Y]US2012069705 (ZHAO JINSONG [US]); | [A]US2004122595 (VALERO HENRI-PIERRE [JP]); | [A]US2011073368 (HAN WEI [US], et al); | [A]US6538958 (BLANKINSHIP THOMAS JAY [US], et al) |