EP2975410 - METHOD FOR SCREENING SUBSTANCE HAVING WHITENING EFFICACY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amorepacific Corporation 106 Hangang-daero Yongsan-gu Seoul 140-777 / KR | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jue Won 1920 Yonggu-daero Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-729 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Hyun Jung 1920 Yonggu-daero Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-729 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Tae Ryong 1920 Yonggu-daero Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-729 / KR | 04 /
CHO, Eun Gyung 1920 Yonggu-daero Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-729 / KR | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14764892.7 | 12.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014KR02066 | Priority number, date | KR20130026604 | 13.03.2013 Original published format: KR 20130026604 | [2016/03] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014142552 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2975410 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2975410 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, A61K8/64, A61Q19/02, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
G01N33/5023 (EP,KR);
A61K8/64 (KR);
A61Q19/02 (KR);
C12Q1/68 (KR);
G01N33/5044 (EP);
G01N33/6881 (EP);
G01N33/6893 (EP);
G01N2333/4703 (EP,KR);
G01N2500/00 (EP);
G01N2800/207 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | G01N33/68, A61K8/64, A61Q19/02, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCREENING NACH EINER SUBSTANZ MIT AUFHELLENDER WIRKUNG | [2016/03] | English: | METHOD FOR SCREENING SUBSTANCE HAVING WHITENING EFFICACY | [2016/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CRIBLAGE DE SUBSTANCE AYANT UNE EFFICACITÉ DE BLANCHISSEMENT | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2015 | Translation filed | 14.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 10.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2014 | AL | 31.01.2018 | AT | 31.01.2018 | CY | 31.01.2018 | CZ | 31.01.2018 | DK | 31.01.2018 | EE | 31.01.2018 | ES | 31.01.2018 | FI | 31.01.2018 | HR | 31.01.2018 | IT | 31.01.2018 | LT | 31.01.2018 | LV | 31.01.2018 | MC | 31.01.2018 | MK | 31.01.2018 | NL | 31.01.2018 | PL | 31.01.2018 | PT | 31.01.2018 | RO | 31.01.2018 | RS | 31.01.2018 | SE | 31.01.2018 | SI | 31.01.2018 | SK | 31.01.2018 | SM | 31.01.2018 | TR | 31.01.2018 | IE | 12.03.2018 | LU | 12.03.2018 | MT | 12.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | BG | 30.04.2018 | NO | 30.04.2018 | GR | 01.05.2018 | IS | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 12.03.2014 | |
AL | 31.01.2018 | ||
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2018 | ||
LU | 12.03.2018 | ||
MT | 12.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2018 | ||
LU | 12.03.2018 | ||
MT | 12.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2018 | ||
LU | 12.03.2018 | ||
MT | 12.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2018 | ||
LU | 12.03.2018 | ||
MT | 12.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2018 | ||
LU | 12.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 12.03.2018 | ||
LU | 12.03.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
LU | 12.03.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | ES | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | ES | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012057567 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * see also family member EP2634262 *; | [A] - J. M. GILLBRO ET AL, "The melanogenesis and mechanisms of skin-lightening agents - existing and new approaches", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COSMETIC SCIENCE, (20110101), doi:10.1111/j.1468-2494.2010.00616.x, ISSN 0142-5463, pages no - no, XP055000016 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1468-2494.2010.00616.x | [T] - GENJI IMOKAWA ET AL, "Inhibitors of Intracellular Signaling Pathways that Lead to Stimulated Epidermal Pigmentation: Perspective of Anti-Pigmenting Agents", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SCIENCES 2012 MDPI AG CHE, (20140512), vol. 15, no. 5, doi:10.3390/ijms15058293, ISSN 1661-6596, pages 8293 - 8315, XP055287377 [T] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijms15058293 | [T] - THANIGAIMALAI PILLAIYAR ET AL, "Inhibitors of melanogenesis: a patent review (2009 - 2014)", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS., GB, (20150504), vol. 25, no. 7, doi:10.1517/13543776.2015.1039985, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 775 - 788, XP055288722 [T] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.2015.1039985 | International search | [A]KR20090054505 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20100039077 (SOOKMYUNG WOMEN S UNIVERSITY I [KR]); | [A]JP2010081913 (KAO CORP); | [A]KR20100138918 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]); | [A]KR20110057147 (KUAKINI MEDICAL CT [US]); | [XP] - KIM ET AL., "FoxO3a Is an Antimelanogenic Factor that Mediates Antioxidant-Induced Depigmentation", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (20140102), vol. 134, no. 5, doi:10.1038/JID.2013.510, pages 1378 - 1388, XP055282679 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/jid.2013.510 |