EP2980688 - DISPLAY CONTROL DEVICE, DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2019/38] |
Former [2016/05] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATAYAMA, Toru c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 1088001 / JP | [2019/38] |
Former [2016/05] | 01 /
KATAYAMA, Toru c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 1088001 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/05] | Application number, filing date | 14774528.5 | 25.03.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014JP58198 | Priority number, date | JP20130070876 | 29.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013070876 | [2016/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014157148 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2980688 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2980688 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
H04L51/52 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06F3/04883 (US);
G06F3/04886 (US);
G06F3/0489 (US);
H04L51/046 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04803 (US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/05] | G06F3/048, G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGESTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ANZEIGESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2016/05] | English: | DISPLAY CONTROL DEVICE, DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD AND PROGRAM | [2016/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE ET PROGRAMME | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2015 | Translation filed | 29.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 24.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2014 | AL | 18.09.2019 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | HR | 18.09.2019 | IT | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | MK | 18.09.2019 | MT | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | RS | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | SM | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | NO | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | IE | 25.03.2020 | LU | 25.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.03.2014 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IE | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 25.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IE | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 25.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IE | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 25.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
LU | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | |
NO | 18.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6630944 (KAKUTA JUN [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [A]US2004015547 (GRIFFIN CHRIS MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0057] *; | [A]WO2009012117 (ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LTD [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [XI]US2013055112 (JOSEPH ARNON [IL], et al) [X] 1,10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0131] * [I] 2-9 | International search | [X]JPH03289737 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]JP2001117849 (SONS LTD); | [A]JP2001325200 (RICOH ELEMEX CORP); | [A]WO2008059594 (OSAKA ELECTRO COMM UNIVERSITY [JP], et al); | [A]JP2012221226 (KISETSU CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2001325200 |